EP1943613 - DOCUMENT COMPRISING AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bundesdruckerei GmbH Oranienstrasse 91 10958 Berlin / DE | [2009/50] |
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states Bundesdruckerei GmbH Oranienstrasse 91 10958 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUTH, Oliver Sameiskystrasse 4 12277 Berlin / DE | 02 /
PFLUGHOEFFT, Malte Reinickendorfer Strasse 63 13347 Berlin / DE | 03 /
HOPPE, Andreas Reinickendorfer Strasse 37 13347 Berlin / DE | 04 /
PASCHKE, Manfred An der Wildbahn 61 16352 Basdorf / DE | 05 /
DRESSEL, Olaf Strasse der Gemeinschaft 25B 14641 Wustermark / DE | [2008/29] | Representative(s) | Richardt, Markus Albert Richardt Patentanwälte GbR ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Richardt, Markus Albert Richardt Patents & Trademarks Leergasse 11 65343 Eltville am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2008/29] | Richardt, Markus Albert Patentanwalt Leergasse 11 65343 Eltville am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 06777764.9 | 13.07.2006 | [2008/29] | WO2006EP64216 | Priority number, date | DE20051052071 | 28.10.2005 Original published format: DE102005052071 | [2008/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007048646 | Date: | 03.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1943613 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1943613 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/06, G06K19/07, G07C9/00, B42D15/10 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
G06K19/06 (EP);
G06K19/07 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOKUMENT MIT EINEM ELEKTRONISCHEN GERÄT | [2008/29] | English: | DOCUMENT COMPRISING AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2008/29] | French: | DOCUMENT COMPRENANT UN APPAREIL ELECTRONIQUE | [2008/29] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 28.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.12.2009 | CZ | 09.12.2009 | DK | 09.12.2009 | EE | 09.12.2009 | IE | 09.12.2009 | IT | 09.12.2009 | LT | 09.12.2009 | LV | 09.12.2009 | NL | 09.12.2009 | RO | 09.12.2009 | SE | 09.12.2009 | SI | 09.12.2009 | SK | 09.12.2009 | TR | 09.12.2009 | BG | 09.03.2010 | GR | 10.03.2010 | ES | 20.03.2010 | IS | 09.04.2010 | PT | 09.04.2010 | HU | 10.06.2010 | LU | 13.07.2010 | BE | 31.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 09.12.2009 | |
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
IT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
HU | 10.06.2010 | ||
LU | 13.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 09.12.2009 | |
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
IT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
HU | 10.06.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/33] | CY | 09.12.2009 | |
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
IT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | CY | 09.12.2009 | |
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
IT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | CY | 09.12.2009 | |
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | CY | 09.12.2009 | |
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | CZ | 09.12.2009 | |
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | LT | 09.12.2009 | |
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/26] | LT | 09.12.2009 | |
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4298115 (BRADLEY ROBERT F, et al) [Y] 23-26 * column 2, line 29 - column 5, line 37 *; | [XY]DE4205403 (BARAINSKY MARKUS [DE]) [X] 1,13-20,22 * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 35 * * column 5, line 11 - column 6, line 46 * [Y] 23-26; | [X]WO0182004 (DIIKON TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,13-17,30-34 * page 8, line 4 - page 11, line 12 * * page 14, line 27 - page 21, line 30 *; | [A]US2003014894 (HAAS DAVID [US]) [A] 1-34 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0020] ** paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0059] *; | [X]EP1381159 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1-12,14,19,21,27-29 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0280] - paragraph [0285] * |