EP1910166 - IMPROVED PRIMARY ENGINE STRUT STRUCTURE OF AN AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIRBUS OPERATIONS (S.A.S) 316, route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | For all designated states AIRBUS OPERATIONS (S.A.S) 316 route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse / FR | ||
Former [2010/12] | For all designated states AIRBUS France 316 Route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse / FR | ||
Former [2008/16] | For all designated states AIRBUS France 316, Route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EVE, Olivier 9 rue François Longaud F-31400 Toulouse / FR | 02 /
CABANAC, Jean-Pierre 2, rue Lucien Lafay F-31170 Tournefeuille / FR | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie SCHMIT CHRETIEN 111, Cours du Médoc 33300 Bordeaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie SCHMIT CHRETIEN SCHIHIN 111 Cours du Médoc 33300 Bordeaux / FR | ||
Former [2008/16] | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie SCHMIT CHRETIEN SCHIHIN 111 Cours du Médoc CS 40009 33070 Bordeaux Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06777772.2 | 13.07.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006EP64240 | Priority number, date | FR20050052439 | 05.08.2005 Original published format: FR 0552439 | [2008/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007017339 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1910166 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B64D27/18 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
B64D27/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE PRIMÄRTRIEBWERKSSTREBENSTRUKTUR FÜR EIN FLUGZEUG | [2008/16] | English: | IMPROVED PRIMARY ENGINE STRUT STRUCTURE OF AN AIRCRAFT | [2008/16] | French: | STRUCTURE PRIMAIRE DE MÂT DE MOTEUR D'AÉRONEF PERFECTIONNÉE | [2008/16] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 15.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/32] | 24.03.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.04.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4437627 (MOOREHEAD JAMES R [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 6, line 11 - line 16 * * column 11, line 62 - column 12, line 16 * * figure 6 *; | [A]US4471609 (PORTER KENNETH W [US], et al) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [X]US5467941 (CHEE WAN T [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 8, line 40 - column 9, line 15 * * figure 1 * | Examination | US5452867 |