EP1915695 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR STORING DATA AND/OR COMMANDS IN A COMPUTER SYSTEM HAVING AT LEAST TWO PROCESSING UNITS AND AT LEAST ONE FIRST MEMORY OR MEMORY AREA FOR DATA AND/OR COMMANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.08.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEIBERLE, Reinhard Kalkaeckerstr. 10 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | 02 /
MUELLER, Bernd Stahler Str. 38 70839 Gerlingen / DE | 03 /
BOEHL, Eberhard Heimbuehlstr. 36 72768 Reutlingen / DE | 04 /
COLLANI, Yorck Lisztweg 9 71717 Beilstein / DE | 05 /
GMEHLICH, Rainer Hoehenweg 2 71254 Ditzingen / DE | [2008/18] | Application number, filing date | 06777976.9 | 26.07.2006 | [2008/18] | WO2006EP64661 | Priority number, date | DE20051037215 | 08.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005037215 | [2008/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007017376 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1915695 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/08 | [2008/18] | CPC: |
G06F12/084 (EP);
G06F12/0846 (EP);
G06F12/0853 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SPEICHERUNG VON DATEN UND/ODER BEFEHLEN IN EINEM RECHNERSYSTEM MIT WENIGSTENS ZWEI VERARBEITUNGSEINHEITEN UND WENIGSTENS EINEM ERSTEN SPEICHER ODER SPEICHERBEREICH FÜR DATEN UND/ODER BEFEHLE | [2008/18] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR STORING DATA AND/OR COMMANDS IN A COMPUTER SYSTEM HAVING AT LEAST TWO PROCESSING UNITS AND AT LEAST ONE FIRST MEMORY OR MEMORY AREA FOR DATA AND/OR COMMANDS | [2008/18] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR ENREGISTRER DES DONNEES ET/OU DES ORDRES DANS UN SYSTEME INFORMATIQUE COMPRENANT AU MOINS DEUX UNITES DE TRAITEMENT ET AU MOINS UNE PREMIERE MEMOIRE OU ZONE DE MEMOIRE POUR DES DONNEES ET/OU DES ORDRES | [2008/18] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/18] | 06.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/36] | 30.04.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE10332700 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-22 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0020] * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US5247649 (BANDOH TADAAKI [JP]) [Y] 1-22 * abstract * * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 21 * * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 16 * * column 3, line 47 - column 5, line 27 * * figures 1-3,5-8 *; | [A]US6101589 (FUHRMANN HORST [DE], et al) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * column 2, line 16 - line 55 * * column 3, line 16 - line 62 * * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE10332700 | US5247649 |