EP1924182 - VACUUM CLEANER NOZZLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2015/01] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/22] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Str. 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÖCK, Armin Stockgasse 1 97633 Grossbardorf / DE | 02 /
GEIS, Marko Ziegelhütte 14 97640 Oberstreu / DE | 03 /
KLEINHENZ, Albert Auerhahnstr. 12 97659 Schönau / DE | 04 /
SEITH, Thomas Martin-Luther-Str. 9 97616 Bad Neustadt / DE | [2008/22] | Application number, filing date | 06778325.8 | 23.08.2006 | [2008/22] | WO2006EP65600 | Priority number, date | DE20051041864 | 02.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005041864 | [2008/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007025923 | Date: | 08.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1924182 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1924182 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2015/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/02, A47L9/06 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
A47L9/06 (EP);
A47L9/02 (EP);
A47L9/0673 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STAUBSAUGERDÜSE | [2008/22] | English: | VACUUM CLEANER NOZZLE | [2008/22] | French: | BUSE D'ASPIRATEUR | [2008/22] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 08.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.08.2006 | BG | 31.12.2014 | CY | 31.12.2014 | CZ | 31.12.2014 | DK | 31.12.2014 | EE | 31.12.2014 | ES | 31.12.2014 | FI | 31.12.2014 | IT | 31.12.2014 | LT | 31.12.2014 | LV | 31.12.2014 | MC | 31.12.2014 | NL | 31.12.2014 | PL | 31.12.2014 | PT | 31.12.2014 | RO | 31.12.2014 | SE | 31.12.2014 | SI | 31.12.2014 | SK | 31.12.2014 | TR | 31.12.2014 | GR | 01.04.2015 | IS | 30.04.2015 | AT | 23.08.2015 | IE | 23.08.2015 | LU | 23.08.2015 | BE | 31.08.2015 | CH | 31.08.2015 | LI | 31.08.2015 | [2018/37] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 23.08.2006 | |
BG | 31.12.2014 | ||
CY | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
TR | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
AT | 23.08.2015 | ||
IE | 23.08.2015 | ||
LU | 23.08.2015 | ||
BE | 31.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
AT | 23.08.2015 | ||
IE | 23.08.2015 | ||
LU | 23.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
IE | 23.08.2015 | ||
LU | 23.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
LU | 23.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
LU | 23.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
LU | 23.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 31.12.2014 | |
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 31.12.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE29610327U (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7-9 * page 2, line 7 - page 3, line 5 * * figure 1 * [Y] 4,6,10-12; | [Y]JPH08238201 (SHINOZAKI KAZUHIRO) [Y] 4,6 * abstract * * figure - *; | [Y]US2001032371 (PARK JUNG-SEON [KR]) [Y] 10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0013] , [0017] * * figures 4,5 *; | [Y]FR2818115 (S N P 2 I [FR]) [Y] 11,12 * abstract ** figure - *; | [X]WO02067748 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-9,11 * abstract * * claims 1,2,27,29 * * figures 1-3 * |