EP1946060 - PRESSURE SENSOR FOR HYDRAULIC MEDIA IN MOTOR VEHICLE BRAKING SYSTEMS AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | [2008/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURGHARDT, Roland Buber-Neumann-Weg 106 60439 Frankfurt An Main / DE | 02 /
ZAHOUT-HEIL, Carsten Rossdörfer Strasse 68a 64287 Darmstadt / DE | [2008/30] | Application number, filing date | 06778327.4 | 23.08.2006 | [2008/30] | WO2006EP65602 | Priority number, date | DE20051039980 | 23.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005039980 | DE20061039422 | 23.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006039422 | [2008/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007023168 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1946060 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01L9/00 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
G01L9/0055 (EP,US);
G01L19/086 (EP,US);
G01L9/0075 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2008/38] |
Former [2008/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DRUCKSENSOR FÜR HYDRAULISCHE MEDIEN IN KRAFTFAHRZEUGBREMSSYSTEMEN UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG | [2008/30] | English: | PRESSURE SENSOR FOR HYDRAULIC MEDIA IN MOTOR VEHICLE BRAKING SYSTEMS AND USE THEREOF | [2008/30] | French: | CAPTEUR DE PRESSION POUR FLUIDES HYDRAULIQUES DANS LES SYSTEMES DE FREINS DE VEHICULES A MOTEUR ET SON UTILISATION | [2008/30] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 26.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/32] | 31.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.08.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE2706505 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO) [Y] 3 * page 13, line 1 - line 29; figures 7A,7B *; | [XY]EP0829710 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,6-9 * abstract * * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 2 * [Y] 3,5,10-12; | [XY]DE10323297 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1,2,6-9,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034] * [Y] 3,5,10-12; | [Y]US2004133092 (KAIN ARON Z [US]) [Y] 5,10-12 * abstract ** paragraph [0070] * | Examination | DE19858828 | DE19847563 |