EP1919526 - AIR DISINFECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oy Desinfinator Ltd Enqvistinkatu 7 33400 Tampere / FI | [2008/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELENIUS, Juha Liinaharjantie 43 B FI-28610 Pori / FI | [2008/20] | Representative(s) | Rahkonen, Erkki Juhani, et al Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy Visiokatu 1 33720 Tampere / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Rahkonen, Erkki Juhani, et al Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy Hermiankatu 1 B 33720 Tampere / FI | ||
Former [2008/20] | Rahkonen, Erkki Juhani, et al Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy Hermiankatu 12 B FIN-33720 Tampere / FI | Application number, filing date | 06778534.5 | 04.08.2006 | [2008/20] | WO2006FI50351 | Priority number, date | FI20050005458 | 30.08.2005 Original published format: FI 20055458 | [2008/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007026050 | Date: | 08.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1919526 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61L9/20, A61L9/22, F24F3/16, H01T23/00 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
H01T23/00 (EP,US);
A61L9/20 (EP,FI,US);
A61L9/015 (EP,US);
A61L9/22 (EP,FI,US);
F24F3/16 (FI);
F24F8/192 (EP,US);
F24F8/22 (EP,US);
F24F8/26 (EP,US);
F24F8/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFT-DESINFEKTIONS-VORRICHTUNG | [2008/20] | English: | AIR DISINFECTION DEVICE | [2008/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉSINFECTION D'AIR | [2008/20] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 03.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/28] | 19.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5656063 (HSU MAXWELL [TW]); | [XY]JP2002320665 (YASUNAGA KK); | [YA]WO03016212 (SHAKLEE CORP [US], et al); | [AD]WO2005037409 (JIMCO AS [DK], et al); | [X]US2005186108 (FIELDS WILLIAM MICHAEL [US]) | by applicant | WO2005037409 |