EP1893450 - ENERGY ABSORBING DEVICE FOR A BUMPER BEAM FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE AND A FRONT FACE PROVIDED THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES 8 rue Louis Lormand, BP 517-La Verrière 78321 Le Mesnil St Denis Cedex / FR | [2008/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUINEHUT, Sébastien 21, cours Saint Vincent F-92130 Issy-Les-Moulineaux / FR | 02 /
LAJAUNIE, Emmanuel 9, rue Joseph Bertrand F-78220 Viroflay / FR | 03 /
FONSECA BARBOSA, Marcelo 7, rue Andrea Palladio F-78280 Gyancourt / FR | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/27] | Application number, filing date | 06778615.2 | 19.06.2006 | [2008/10] | WO2006FR01380 | Priority number, date | FR20050006249 | 20.06.2005 Original published format: FR 0506249 | [2008/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006136688 | Date: | 28.12.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1893450 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1893450 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60R19/34, B60R19/03, B60R19/22 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
B60R19/22 (EP);
B60R19/03 (EP);
B60R19/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/10] | Title | German: | ENERGIEABSORBIERENDE VORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE STOSSSTANGE FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG UND DAMIT AUSGESTATTETE FAHRZEUGVORDERFLÄCHE | [2008/10] | English: | ENERGY ABSORBING DEVICE FOR A BUMPER BEAM FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE AND A FRONT FACE PROVIDED THEREWITH | [2008/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF ABSORBEUR D'ENERGIE POUR POUTRE PARE-CHOCS DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE ET FACE AVANT COMPORTANT UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2008/10] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 15.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.06.2006 | AT | 04.07.2012 | CY | 04.07.2012 | DK | 04.07.2012 | EE | 04.07.2012 | FI | 04.07.2012 | IT | 04.07.2012 | LT | 04.07.2012 | LV | 04.07.2012 | MC | 04.07.2012 | NL | 04.07.2012 | RO | 04.07.2012 | SE | 04.07.2012 | SI | 04.07.2012 | TR | 04.07.2012 | BG | 04.10.2012 | GR | 05.10.2012 | IS | 04.11.2012 | PT | 05.11.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
MC | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
TR | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
MC | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | SI | 04.07.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2997325 (PETERSON GERALD H) [X] 1,17,18 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 11 * * column 4, lines 36-44; figures 1-3,7 *; | [X]US4262778 (FLUSIN FRANCOIS) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR2842152 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1,16 * column 3, paragraph L - column 4, line 51; figures 1,4 *; | [A]US6702345 (YOSHIDA HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 1, lines 14-19 * |