EP1896669 - HOLLOW U-SHAPED SECTION AND MODULE FOR THE RAPID ASSEMBLY OF PIECES OF TIMBER, WHICH IS INTENDED, IN PARTICULAR, FOR THE CONSTRUCTION OF BUILDING STRUCTURES OR FRAMES, AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De Gryse, Régis-Henri 18, allée des Meuniers 59260 Lezennes / FR | [2008/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/11] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2009/23] |
Former [2008/11] | Hennion, Jean-Claude Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 27bis, rue du Vieux Faubourg 59800 Lille / FR | Application number, filing date | 06778709.3 | 27.06.2006 | [2008/11] | WO2006FR01517 | Priority number, date | FR20050006486 | 27.06.2005 Original published format: FR 0506486 | [2008/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007000515 | Date: | 04.01.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1896669 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/26, E04B1/58 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
E04B1/26 (EP);
E04B2001/266 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/11] | Extension states | RS | 04.01.2008 | Title | German: | U-FÖRMIGES HOHLPROFIL UND MODUL FÜR DIE SCHNELLE MONTAGE VON HOLZSTÜCKEN, INSBESONDERE ZUR KONSTRUKTION VON GEBÄUDESTRUKTUREN ODER RAHMEN, UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2008/11] | English: | HOLLOW U-SHAPED SECTION AND MODULE FOR THE RAPID ASSEMBLY OF PIECES OF TIMBER, WHICH IS INTENDED, IN PARTICULAR, FOR THE CONSTRUCTION OF BUILDING STRUCTURES OR FRAMES, AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF | [2008/11] | French: | PROFILE CREUX A SECTION EN U ET MODULE POUR L'ASSEMBLAGE RAPIDE DE PIECES DE BOIS, NOTAMMENT POUR LA CONSTRUCTION D'OSSATURES, CHARPENTES OU STRUCTURES DE BATIMENT, ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2008/11] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 17.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/25] | 04.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2009 | 30.06.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0244486 (SIMPSON STRONG TIE CO [US]; LEEK WILLIAM [US]) [X] 1-3,10 * page 6, lines 23-25 * * page 10, lines 5,6 * * page 11, lines 25-27; figures 1,2,4,6,7 *; | [X]US2002020137 (COMMINS ALFRED D [US]) [X] 1-3,10 * paragraphs [0015] , [0017] , [0021] , [0044] , [0050] - [0052]; figures 1,3,6,15 *; | [Y]WO2004065708 (DUERDOTH GEORG M [CH]) [Y] 1-11 * page 2, lines 4-8 * * page 6, lines 9-11 * * page 9, lines 14-17 * * page 14, lines 29-31; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE1808877U (GIBJOINTS LTD) [Y] 1-11 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 5, paragraphs 1,3,4; figures 5-9 *; | [Y]US3423898 (TRACY CHARLES W ET AL) [Y] 1-11 * column 2, lines 54-58; figures 7,16 *; | [Y]US5042217 (BUGBEE MICHAEL W [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-11 * column 1, lines 22-26; figures 2,9 *; | [A]US949394 (D J DALY) [A] 1,4,10 * figures 1,3,5 * |