EP1899537 - CLEANING AGENT DISPENSER FOR A FLUSHING TANK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allard, Gilles 60, Rue Waldeck Rousseau 69006 Lyon / FR | For all designated states Soll, Michaël 17, Chemin de Montlouis 69230 Saint Genis Laval / FR | [2008/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/12] | Representative(s) | Oudin, Stéphane, et al JurisPatent Paris - Cabinet GUIU 28 Rue d'Aboukir 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Oudin, Stéphane, et al JurisPatent Paris - Cabinet GUIU 28 Rue d'Aboukir 75002 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/17] | Puiroux, Guy, et al Jurispatent Cabinet Guiu & Bruder 68, rue d'Hauteville 75010 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/12] | Gauer, Pierre Cabinet Guiu & Bruder 68, Rue d'Hauteville 75010 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06778720.0 | 29.06.2006 | [2008/12] | WO2006FR01528 | Priority number, date | FR20050007021 | 01.07.2005 Original published format: FR 0507021 | FR20050010173 | 05.10.2005 Original published format: FR 0510173 | [2008/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007003772 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1899537 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E03D9/03 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
E03D9/037 (EP,US);
E03D2009/028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/12] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSMITTELSPENDER FÜR EINEN SPÜLKASTEN | [2008/12] | English: | CLEANING AGENT DISPENSER FOR A FLUSHING TANK | [2008/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF DISTRIBUTEUR D'UN PRODUIT NETTOYANT POUR CHASSE D'EAU | [2008/12] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 08.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.05.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 19.05.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.06.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   06.08.2009 | 30.06.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DYA]US2726406 (NUNES VIERRA ANTONE) [DY] 1 * column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 6; figure - * [A] 3,6,7; | [YA]US3229854 (TURNQUIST ALFRED H) [Y] 1 * column 4, line 1 - line 25 * * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 29; figures 2-4 * [A] 2,4,5; | [A]DE71113 (CARL LUCHT) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [DA]FR2808897 (ALEXANDRE JEAN NOEL [FR]) [DA] 1,10-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US6654970 (VAN JACK F J [TW]) [A] 1,14,15 * column 4, line 31 - column 5, line 7; figures 1,4 * |