EP1931562 - CAPSIZE ALERTING APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Royal National Lifeboat Institution CPRS Office RNLI Headquaters, West Quay Road Poole Dorset, BH15 1HZ / GB | [2008/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARK, Cecil Royal National Lifeboat Institution CPRS Office RNLI Headquaters West Quay Road Poole, Dorset BH15 1HZ / GB | 02 /
MORGAN, Mark Royal National Lifeboat Institution CPRS Office RNLI Headquaters West Quay Road Poole, Dorset BH15 1HZ / GB | [2008/25] | Representative(s) | DeVile, Jonathan Mark D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/25] | DeVile, Jonathan Mark D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 06779345.5 | 08.09.2006 | [2008/25] | WO2006GB03327 | Priority number, date | GB20050018452 | 09.09.2005 Original published format: GB 0518452 | [2008/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007029005 | Date: | 15.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1931562 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1931562 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B63B43/00, B63B45/04 | [2008/25] | CPC: |
B63B43/00 (EP,US);
B63C9/21 (GB);
B63B45/04 (EP,US);
G08B25/10 (GB);
H01Q1/34 (GB);
B63C9/00 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KENTERMELDUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN | [2008/25] | English: | CAPSIZE ALERTING APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2008/25] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D' ALERTE DE CHAVIREMENT | [2010/03] |
Former [2008/25] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D' ALERTE DE CHAVIREMENT | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/25] | 22.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.06.2010 | BE | 02.06.2010 | CY | 02.06.2010 | CZ | 02.06.2010 | DK | 02.06.2010 | EE | 02.06.2010 | FI | 02.06.2010 | LT | 02.06.2010 | LV | 02.06.2010 | NL | 02.06.2010 | PL | 02.06.2010 | RO | 02.06.2010 | SE | 02.06.2010 | SI | 02.06.2010 | SK | 02.06.2010 | TR | 02.06.2010 | BG | 02.09.2010 | GR | 03.09.2010 | IE | 08.09.2010 | LU | 08.09.2010 | CH | 30.09.2010 | LI | 30.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | IS | 02.10.2010 | PT | 04.10.2010 | HU | 03.12.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
BE | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
TR | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
LU | 08.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
HU | 03.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
BE | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
LU | 08.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
HU | 03.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
BE | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
HU | 03.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
BE | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
BE | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
BE | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
BE | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3906370 (APPS DAVID JOHN); | [Y]US4871996 (TSUNAMOTO KANICHI [JP], et al); | [Y]WO9847119 (DECUIR JEFFREY P [US]) |