EP1881921 - RUNNING CONTROL APPARATUS FOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/05] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKUGAWA, Jun c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
MONZAKI, Shiro c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2010/42] |
Former [2008/05] | 01 /
SAKUGAWA, Jun c/o Toyota Jidosha K. K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
MONZAKI, Shiro c/o Toyota Jidosha K. K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/05] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06779698.7 | 15.05.2006 | [2008/05] | WO2006IB01258 | Priority number, date | JP20050144959 | 18.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005144959 | [2008/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006123215 | Date: | 23.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1881921 | Date: | 30.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1881921 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60T10/00 | [2008/05] | CPC: |
B60W10/20 (EP,KR,US);
B60W30/02 (EP,KR,US);
B60T8/1755 (EP,US);
B60W10/18 (EP,KR,US);
B60W30/182 (EP,US);
B60W40/114 (KR);
B62D6/003 (EP,US);
B62D6/007 (EP,US);
B60T2210/24 (EP,US);
B60T2260/02 (EP,US);
B60W2540/106 (EP,US);
B60W2552/20 (EP,US);
B60W2552/30 (EP);
B60W2710/18 (EP,US);
B60W2710/20 (EP,US);
B60W40/09 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/24] |
Former [2008/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BETRIEBSSTEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2008/05] | English: | RUNNING CONTROL APPARATUS FOR VEHICLE | [2008/05] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE COURSE POUR VEHICULES | [2008/05] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/05] | 28.01.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE10328685 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-9,14-16,19-23 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0020] , [0027] - [0029]; figures 1-3 * [I] 10-13,17,18; | [A]WO0189898 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [A] 10,11,13,18,22,23 * page 1, paragraph 2 *; | [A]US5913910 (OCHI TATSUYA [JP], et al) [A] 7,8,10,11,13,18,22,23 * abstract * * column 1, line 40 - line 45 * * column 3, line 7 - line 21 *; | [A]EP1357008 (AISIN SEIKI [JP], et al) [A] 12,20,21 * paragraph [0022] *; | [DA]JP2003175749 ; | [A]US2003060960 (HARTMANN UWE [DE]) [A] 22,23 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] *; | [A]EP1369288 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [A] 1,5,7 * paragraph [0059] *; | [A]JPH04266538 | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031008), vol. 2003, no. 10, & JP2003175749 A 20030624 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP; TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV LAB INC) [DA] 1,5,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930204), vol. 017, no. 056, Database accession no. (M - 1362), & JP04266538 A 19920922 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 12,20,21 * abstract * |