EP1909867 - SANITARY INSTRUMENT FOR THE IRRIGATION OF ANATOMIC CANALS, ESPECIALLY THE RECTAL CANAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR Updated state(s): IE | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | 15.07.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lameplast SPA Via Verga, 1/27 41016 Novi di Modena Frazione Rovereto sul Secchia (MO) / IT | [2010/36] |
Former [2008/16] | For all designated states Lameplast SPA Via G.Verga, 9/27, I-41030 Novi di Modena- Frazione Rovereto Sul Sec, chia / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FONTANA, Antonio Via Due Ponti, 82 I-41012 Carpi (MO) / IT | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Brunacci, Marco, et al BRUNACCI & PARTNERS S.r.l. Via Pietro Giardini, 625 41125 Modena (MO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | Brunacci, Marco, et al BRUNACCI & PARTNERS S.r.l. Via Scaglia Est, 19-31 41126 Modena / IT | ||
Former [2011/15] | Brunacci, Marco, et al BRUNACCI & PARTNERS S.r.l. Via Giardini 625 41125 Modena / IT | ||
Former [2010/48] | Brunacci, Marco APTA S.r.l. Via Giardini 625 41125 Modena / IT | ||
Former [2009/52] | Brogi, Graziano APTA S.R.L. Consulenti in Proprietà Industriale Via Giardini, 625 41125 Modena / IT | ||
Former [2008/16] | Brogi, Graziano c/o APTA S.R.L. Via Giardini 625 41100 Modena / IT | Application number, filing date | 06779712.6 | 14.06.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006IB01576 | Priority number, date | IT2005MO00147 | 14.06.2005 Original published format: IT MO20050147 | [2008/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006134464 | Date: | 21.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1909867 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1909867 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61M3/02, A61F5/00 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
A61M3/0262 (EP,US);
A61F5/0093 (EP);
A61M2210/1067 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Title | German: | SANITÄRINSTRUMENT ZUR IRRIGATION VON ANATOMISCHEN KANÄLEN, INSBESONDERE DEM REKTALKANAL | [2008/16] | English: | SANITARY INSTRUMENT FOR THE IRRIGATION OF ANATOMIC CANALS, ESPECIALLY THE RECTAL CANAL | [2008/16] | French: | INSTRUMENT MÉDICAL POUR IRRIGUER DES CONDUITS ANATOMIQUES, NOTAMMENT LE CANAL RECTAL | [2014/04] |
Former [2008/16] | INSTRUMENT MEDICAL POUR IRRIGUER DES CONDUITS ANATOMIQUES, NOTAMMENT LE CANAL RECTAL | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 19.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.06.2006 | AT | 30.04.2014 | BE | 30.04.2014 | CY | 30.04.2014 | CZ | 30.04.2014 | DK | 30.04.2014 | EE | 30.04.2014 | FI | 30.04.2014 | LT | 30.04.2014 | LV | 30.04.2014 | MC | 30.04.2014 | NL | 30.04.2014 | PL | 30.04.2014 | RO | 30.04.2014 | SE | 30.04.2014 | SI | 30.04.2014 | SK | 30.04.2014 | TR | 30.04.2014 | IE | 14.06.2014 | LU | 14.06.2014 | CH | 30.06.2014 | LI | 30.06.2014 | BG | 30.07.2014 | GR | 31.07.2014 | IS | 30.08.2014 | PT | 01.09.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 14.06.2006 | |
AT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 14.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 14.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 14.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 14.06.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 14.06.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 14.06.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 30.04.2014 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4248228 (SILVER JULES) [Y] 12 * figure 2 *; | [XY]EP0139855 (CHRISTENSEN PLANTORGAN WERK [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,11 * figure 5 * [Y] 12; | [X]US5843043 (MARKUS GEORGE [US]) [X] 1-4 * column W *; | [A]US2003088217 (BERGERON MICHEL G [CA], et al) [A] 1-15* column W * | by applicant | US4248228 | EP0139855 | US5843043 | US2003088217 |