EP1910483 - PAINT COMPOSITION, A METHOD OF PAINT FINISHING AND PAINTED OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Coatings Japan Ltd. Totsuka Plant, 296, Shimokurata-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama 244-0815 / JP | [2008/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONISHI, Tetsu 2-9-53 Tsurugaoka Yokosuka Kanagawa 238-0056 / JP | 02 /
MITSUMUNE, Shinji 3-12-907 Minami-Fujisawa Fujisawa Kanagawa 251-0055 / JP | 03 /
TAKEMOTO, Masayuki 10-15-203 Daimaru Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama 224-0061 / JP | 04 /
ITO, Takehito 6-2-17 Minamino, Hachioji Tokyo 192-0916 / JP | 05 /
TAKAGI, Hiroyuki 294-506 Ogura, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 212-0054 / JP | 06 /
NIIMI, Rui Wiesenstrasse 9 48 165 Münster / DE | [2008/28] |
Former [2008/16] | 01 /
KONISHI, Tetsu 2-9-53 Tsurugaoka Yokosuka Kanagawa 238-0056 / JP | ||
02 /
MITSUMUNE, Shinji 3-12-907 Minami-Fujisawa Fujisawa Kanagawa 251-0055 / JP | |||
03 /
TAKEMOTO, Masayuki 10-15-203 Daimaru Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama 224-0061 / JP | |||
04 /
ITO, Takehito 6-2-17 Minamino, Hachioji Tokyo 192-0916 / JP | |||
05 /
TAGKAGI, Hiroyuki 473 Shimokurata-cho Totsuka-tu Yokohama 244-0815 / JP | |||
06 /
NIIMI, Rui Wiesenstrasse 9 48 165 Münster / DE | Representative(s) | Fischer, Jens-Dieter W.E., et al BASF Coatings GmbH Patente/Lizenzen, Marken/Dokumentation Postfach 61 23 48136 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | Fischer, Jens-Dieter W.E., et al BASF Coatings AG Patente/Marken/Lizenzen Postfach 61 23 48136 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 06779904.9 | 13.07.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006IB02057 | Priority number, date | JP20050226286 | 04.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005226286 | [2008/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007015130 | Date: | 08.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1910483 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C09D133/00, C08F8/00, C08J7/00 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
C09D133/066 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
C08L33/066 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09D133/066, C08L2666/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FARBZUSAMMENSETZUNG, FARBFERTIGUNGSVERFAHREN SOWIE ANGESTRICHENE ARTIKEL | [2008/16] | English: | PAINT COMPOSITION, A METHOD OF PAINT FINISHING AND PAINTED OBJECTS | [2008/16] | French: | COMPOSITION DE PEINTURE, PROCEDE DE FINITION A LA PEINTURE ET OBJETS PEINTS | [2008/16] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 30.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/25] | 15.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4005155 (SAMPSON KEITH GEORGE, et al) [A] 1-7* the whole document * |