EP1906908 - INTERMITTENT MOTION CAPSULE FILLING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states I.M.A. INDUSTRIA MACCHINE AUTOMATICHE S.p.A. Via Emilia Levante, 428-442 40064 Ozzano Emilia (BO) / IT | [2008/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TREBBI, Roberto Via Forno Rosso, 2/3 I-40055 Castenaso / IT | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Lanzoni, Luciano, et al Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/06] | Lanzoni, Luciano, et al Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | ||
Former [2008/15] | Lanzoni, Luciano, et al c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via Goito, 18 40126 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 06779930.4 | 24.07.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006IB02133 | Priority number, date | EP20050425556 | 28.07.2005 Original published format: EP 05425556 | [2008/15] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007012966 | Date: | 01.02.2007 | Language: | IT | [2007/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1906908 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1906908 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61J3/07 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
A61J3/074 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAPSELFÜLLMASCHINE MIT INTERMITTIERENDER BEWEGUNG | [2011/02] | English: | INTERMITTENT MOTION CAPSULE FILLING MACHINE | [2008/15] | French: | MACHINE DE REMPLISSAGE DE CAPSULES À MOUVEMENT INTERMITTENT | [2008/15] |
Former [2008/15] | KAPSELFÜLLUNGSMASCHINE MIT INTERMITTIERENDEM BETRIEB | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2006 | Translation filed | 06.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 02.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.02.2011 | BE | 09.02.2011 | CY | 09.02.2011 | CZ | 09.02.2011 | DK | 09.02.2011 | EE | 09.02.2011 | FI | 09.02.2011 | HU | 09.02.2011 | IS | 09.02.2011 | LT | 09.02.2011 | LV | 09.02.2011 | NL | 09.02.2011 | PL | 09.02.2011 | RO | 09.02.2011 | SE | 09.02.2011 | SI | 09.02.2011 | SK | 09.02.2011 | TR | 09.02.2011 | BG | 09.05.2011 | GR | 10.05.2011 | PT | 09.06.2011 | IE | 24.07.2011 | LU | 24.07.2011 | CH | 31.07.2011 | LI | 31.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
IS | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
TR | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
IE | 24.07.2011 | ||
LU | 24.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
IS | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
IE | 24.07.2011 | ||
LU | 24.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
IE | 24.07.2011 | ||
LU | 24.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
IE | 24.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 09.02.2011 | |
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 09.02.2011 | |
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3446404 (MEHTA MAHARAJ K) [Y] 1-5 * column 1; figure 1 * * column 2, lines 24-27 * * column 3 *; | [Y]FR2348972 (ELBA MACHINEFABRIEKEN BV [NL]) [Y] 5* page 3, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [Y]US4450877 (WALKER STEPHEN E [GB], et al) [Y] 4 * column 5; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US6367228 (WURST REINER [DE], et al) [Y] 1-5 * column 2, lines 23-67; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2004168400 (JOHNSTON LLOYD P [US], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0034]; figure 4 * |