EP1905279 - GAS DISCHARGE LAMP IGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | [2013/39] |
Former [2009/47] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2008/46] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2008/14] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEPPE, Carsten C/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
LUERKENS, Peter C/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
DURAN, Raul C/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | Bekkers, Joost J.J. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | Bekkers, Joost J.J Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 06780014.4 | 03.07.2006 | [2008/14] | WO2006IB52231 | Priority number, date | EP20050106136 | 06.07.2005 Original published format: EP 05106136 | [2008/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007004191 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1905279 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/288, H05B41/04 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
H05B41/2881 (EP,US);
H05B41/042 (EP,US);
Y02B20/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/14] | Title | German: | ZÜNDUNG EINER GASENTLADUNGSLAMPE | [2008/14] | English: | GAS DISCHARGE LAMP IGNITION | [2008/14] | French: | ALLUMAGE POUR LAMPE A DECHARGE | [2008/14] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 31.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/04] | 04.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.10.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1345478 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE]) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0009] - [0019] * * figure 1 *; | [PX]EP1653785 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE]) [PX] 1-16 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] * * paragraphs [0009] - [0017] * * figures 1-9 *; | [AD]WO0077826 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [AD] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP1272012 (USHIO ELECTRIC INC [JP]) [DA] 1-16 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6734643 | US6563267 |