EP1909770 - ORAL CONTROLLED RELEASE COMPOSITION CONTAINING LEVETIRACETAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sun Pharma Advanced Research Company Ltd 17/B Mahal Industrial Estate OFF, Mahakali Caves Road Andheri (East) Mumbai 400 093 / IN | [2013/20] |
Former [2008/16] | For all designated states Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited Acme Plaza Andheri Kurla Road Andheri (East) Mumbai 400 059 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZALA, Yashoraj, Rupsinh 17/B Mahal Ind. Estate Off Mahakali Caves Road Andheri (East), Mumbai 400093 / IN | 02 /
DHARMADHIKARI, Nitin Bhalachandra 17/B, Mahal Ind. Estate Off Makali Caves Road Andheri (East), Mumbai 400093 / IN | [2013/12] |
Former [2008/16] | 01 /
ZALA, Yashoraj, Rupsinh 17/B Mahal Ind. Estate, Off Mahakali Caves Road Andheri (East), Mumbai 400093 / IN | ||
02 /
DHARMADHIKARI, Nitin Bhalachandra 17/B, Mahal Ind. Estate, Off Makali Caves Road Andheri (East), Mumbai 400093 / IN | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | ||
Former [2008/28] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | ||
Former [2008/16] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds, LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06780511.9 | 22.02.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006IN00059 | Priority number, date | IN2005MUM0196 | 22.02.2005 Original published format: IN MU01962005 | [2008/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006123357 | Date: | 23.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1909770 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1909770 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 20.09.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K31/4015 | [2012/42] | CPC: |
A61K9/209 (EP,US);
A61K31/4015 (EP,US);
A61P25/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/16] | A61K9/52, A61K31/4015 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Title | German: | KONTROLLIERT FREIGESETZTE, ORALE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT LEVETIRACETAM | [2008/16] | English: | ORAL CONTROLLED RELEASE COMPOSITION CONTAINING LEVETIRACETAM | [2008/16] | French: | COMPOSITION A LIBERATION ORALE CONTROLEE CONTENANT DU LEVETIRACETAM | [2008/16] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 31.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2007 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 25.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.09.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.02.2006 | AT | 20.03.2013 | BE | 20.03.2013 | CY | 20.03.2013 | CZ | 20.03.2013 | DK | 20.03.2013 | EE | 20.03.2013 | FI | 20.03.2013 | IT | 20.03.2013 | LT | 20.03.2013 | LV | 20.03.2013 | MC | 20.03.2013 | NL | 20.03.2013 | PL | 20.03.2013 | RO | 20.03.2013 | SE | 20.03.2013 | SI | 20.03.2013 | SK | 20.03.2013 | TR | 20.03.2013 | BG | 20.06.2013 | GR | 21.06.2013 | IS | 20.07.2013 | PT | 22.07.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 22.02.2006 | |
AT | 20.03.2013 | ||
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | BE | 20.03.2013 | |
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | BE | 20.03.2013 | |
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 20.03.2013 | |
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 20.03.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03101428 (DESITIN ARZNEIMITTEL GMBH [DE], et al); | [X]US2004180088 (DUDHARA KAMLESH MOHANLAL [IN], et al); | [X]EP1118321 (UCB SA [BE]); | [XP]WO2006080029 (ALEMBIC LTD [IN], et al) | by applicant | WO03101428 |