EP1898136 - FLOW CONTROL VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CKD Corporation 250, Ouji 2-chome Komaki-shi Aichi-ken 485-8551 / JP | [2008/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Akihiro c/o CKD CORPORATION 250, Ouji 2-chome Komaki-shi, Aichi 485-8551 / JP | 02 /
SEKO, Naotsugu c/o CKD CORPORATION 250, Ouji 2-chome Komaki-shi, Aichi 485-8551 / JP | 03 /
MATSUOKA, Yoshihiro c/o CKD CORPORATION 250, Ouji 2-chome Komaki-shi, Aichi 485-8551 / JP | 04 /
NIWA, Manami c/o CKD CORPORATION 250, Ouji 2-chome Komaki-shi, Aichi 485-8551 / JP | [2008/11] | Representative(s) | Hofer, Dorothea, et al Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/11] | Hofer, Dorothea, et al Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06780625.7 | 20.06.2006 | [2008/11] | WO2006JP312338 | Priority number, date | JP20050185280 | 24.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005185280 | [2008/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006137404 | Date: | 28.12.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1898136 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1898136 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.12.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/06, G01F1/684, G05D7/06 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
G01F1/684 (EP,US);
F16K31/0658 (EP,KR,US);
G01F1/6842 (EP,KR,US);
G01F15/00 (EP,US);
G01F15/005 (KR);
G01F5/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/11] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STROMREGELVENTIL | [2008/11] | English: | FLOW CONTROL VALVE | [2008/11] | French: | VALVE DE RÉGULATION DE DÉBIT | [2008/11] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2008 | Translation filed | 08.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 26.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.01.2010 | BE | 13.01.2010 | CY | 13.01.2010 | CZ | 13.01.2010 | DK | 13.01.2010 | EE | 13.01.2010 | FI | 13.01.2010 | IT | 13.01.2010 | LT | 13.01.2010 | LV | 13.01.2010 | NL | 13.01.2010 | PL | 13.01.2010 | RO | 13.01.2010 | SE | 13.01.2010 | SI | 13.01.2010 | SK | 13.01.2010 | TR | 13.01.2010 | BG | 13.04.2010 | GR | 14.04.2010 | ES | 24.04.2010 | IS | 13.05.2010 | PT | 13.05.2010 | IE | 20.06.2010 | LU | 20.06.2010 | CH | 30.06.2010 | LI | 30.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | HU | 14.07.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 13.01.2010 | |
BE | 13.01.2010 | ||
CY | 13.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2010 | ||
DK | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
IT | 13.01.2010 | ||
LT | 13.01.2010 | ||
LV | 13.01.2010 | ||
NL | 13.01.2010 | ||
PL | 13.01.2010 | ||
RO | 13.01.2010 | ||
SE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
SK | 13.01.2010 | ||
BG | 13.04.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 24.04.2010 | ||
IS | 13.05.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
IE | 20.06.2010 | ||
LU | 20.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
HU | 14.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 13.01.2010 | |
BE | 13.01.2010 | ||
CY | 13.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2010 | ||
DK | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
IT | 13.01.2010 | ||
LT | 13.01.2010 | ||
LV | 13.01.2010 | ||
NL | 13.01.2010 | ||
PL | 13.01.2010 | ||
RO | 13.01.2010 | ||
SE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
SK | 13.01.2010 | ||
BG | 13.04.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 24.04.2010 | ||
IS | 13.05.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
IE | 20.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
HU | 14.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 13.01.2010 | |
BE | 13.01.2010 | ||
CY | 13.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2010 | ||
DK | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
IT | 13.01.2010 | ||
LT | 13.01.2010 | ||
LV | 13.01.2010 | ||
NL | 13.01.2010 | ||
PL | 13.01.2010 | ||
RO | 13.01.2010 | ||
SE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
SK | 13.01.2010 | ||
BG | 13.04.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 24.04.2010 | ||
IS | 13.05.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
IE | 20.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 13.01.2010 | |
BE | 13.01.2010 | ||
CY | 13.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2010 | ||
DK | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
IT | 13.01.2010 | ||
LT | 13.01.2010 | ||
LV | 13.01.2010 | ||
NL | 13.01.2010 | ||
PL | 13.01.2010 | ||
RO | 13.01.2010 | ||
SE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
SK | 13.01.2010 | ||
BG | 13.04.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 24.04.2010 | ||
IS | 13.05.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
IE | 20.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 13.01.2010 | |
BE | 13.01.2010 | ||
CY | 13.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2010 | ||
DK | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
IT | 13.01.2010 | ||
LT | 13.01.2010 | ||
LV | 13.01.2010 | ||
NL | 13.01.2010 | ||
PL | 13.01.2010 | ||
RO | 13.01.2010 | ||
SE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
SK | 13.01.2010 | ||
BG | 13.04.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 24.04.2010 | ||
IS | 13.05.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 13.01.2010 | |
BE | 13.01.2010 | ||
CY | 13.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2010 | ||
DK | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
LT | 13.01.2010 | ||
LV | 13.01.2010 | ||
NL | 13.01.2010 | ||
PL | 13.01.2010 | ||
RO | 13.01.2010 | ||
SE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
SK | 13.01.2010 | ||
BG | 13.04.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 24.04.2010 | ||
IS | 13.05.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 13.01.2010 | |
BE | 13.01.2010 | ||
CY | 13.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
LT | 13.01.2010 | ||
LV | 13.01.2010 | ||
NL | 13.01.2010 | ||
PL | 13.01.2010 | ||
RO | 13.01.2010 | ||
SE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
SK | 13.01.2010 | ||
BG | 13.04.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 24.04.2010 | ||
IS | 13.05.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | AT | 13.01.2010 | |
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
LT | 13.01.2010 | ||
LV | 13.01.2010 | ||
NL | 13.01.2010 | ||
PL | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
ES | 24.04.2010 | ||
IS | 13.05.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 13.01.2010 | |
ES | 24.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 13.01.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4681142 (WOELLER FRITZ H [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]WO2005050075 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * |