EP1892867 - BASE STATION DEVICE, AND MOBILE STATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue, Suite 200 Torrance, CA 90503 / US | [2020/17] |
Former [2014/30] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue Suite 200 Torrance CA 90503 / US | ||
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/09] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKA, Katsuyoshi@Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd IP Development Center OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
HAGA, Hiroki@Panasonic Mobile Communications Sendai R&D Lab 2-5, Akedori, Izumi-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 981-3206 / JP | 03 /
MATSUO, Hidenori@Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd IP Development Center OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2020/17] |
Former [2008/09] | 01 /
NAKA, Katsuyoshi Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd IP Development Center OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
HAGA, Hiroki Panasonic Mobile Communications Sendai R&D Lab 2-5, Akedori, Izumi-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 981-3206 / JP | |||
03 /
MATSUO, Hidenori Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd IP Development Center OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/17] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/09] | Zimmer, Franz-Josef Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06780804.8 | 05.07.2006 | [2008/09] | WO2006JP313428 | Priority number, date | JP20050198608 | 07.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005198608 | [2008/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007007620 | Date: | 18.01.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1892867 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1892867 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04J11/00, H04B1/7083 | [2019/52] | CPC: |
H04J11/0069 (EP,US);
H04B1/7083 (EP,US);
H04L27/2613 (EP,US);
H04L27/2656 (EP,US);
H04L27/2675 (EP,US);
H04L5/005 (US);
H04W72/02 (US);
H04B1/70735 (EP,US);
H04B2201/70701 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/29] | H04J11/00, H04B1/707, H04W4/00 | ||
Former IPC [2008/09] | H04J11/00, H04B1/707, H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2020/17] |
Former [2008/42] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BASISSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND MOBILSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2008/09] | English: | BASE STATION DEVICE, AND MOBILE STATION DEVICE | [2008/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE STATION DE BASE ET DISPOSITIF DE STATION MOBILE | [2008/09] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2008 | Translation filed | 07.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 17.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13189131.9 / EP2696524 | EP13189132.7 / EP2688235 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1337069 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0061]; figures 2,3 * * claims 1-23 *[I] 2-11 |