EP1914232 - N-DIHYDROXYALKYL-SUBSTITUTED 2-OXOIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/17] | N-DIHYDROXYALKYL-SUBSTITUTED 2-OXOIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVE | ||
[2010/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MSD K.K. Kitanomaru Square 1-13-12 Kudankita Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-8667 / JP | [2011/11] |
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states BANYU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Kitanomaru Square 1-13-12, Kudan-kita Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-8667 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASHIMOTO, Masaya BANYU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Tsukuba Research Institute, 3, Okubo Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-2611 / JP | 02 /
IWASAWA, Yoshikazu BANYU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Tsukuba Research Institute, 3, Okubo Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-2611 / JP | 03 /
KAWAMOTO, Hiroshi BANYU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Tsukuba Research Institute, 3, Okubo Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-2611 / JP | 04 /
OHTA, Hisashi BANYU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Tsukuba Research Institute, 3, Okubo Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-2611 / JP | 05 /
OZAKI, Satoshi BANYU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Tsukuba Research Institute, 3, Okubo Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-2611 / JP | 06 /
SAGARA, Takeshi BANYU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Tsukuba Research Institute, 3, Okubo Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-2611 / JP | 07 /
SAKOH, Hiroki BANYU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Tsukuba Research Institute, 3, Okubo Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-2611 / JP | 08 /
SATOH, Atsushi BANYU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Tsukuba Research Institute, 3, Okubo Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-2611 / JP | [2010/28] |
Former [2008/17] | 01 /
HASHIMOTO, Masaya, BANYU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Tsukuba Research Institute, 3, Okubo Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-2611 / JP | ||
02 /
IWASAWA, Yoshikazu, BANYU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Tsukuba Research Institute, 3, Okubo Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-2611 / JP | |||
03 /
KAWAMOTO, Hiroshi, BANYU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Tsukuba Research Institute, 3, Okubo Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-2611 / JP | |||
04 /
OHTA, Hisashi, BANYU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Tsukuba Research Institute, 3, Okubo Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-2611 / JP | |||
05 /
OZAKI, Satoshi, BANYU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Tsukuba Research Institute, 3, Okubo Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-2611 / JP | |||
06 /
SAGARA, Takeshi, BANYU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Tsukuba Research Institute, 3, Okubo Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-2611 / JP | |||
07 /
SAKOH, Hiroki, BANYU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Tsukuba Research Institute, 3, Okubo Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-2611 / JP | |||
08 /
SATOH, Atsushi, BANYU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Tsukuba Research Institute, 3, Okubo Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-2611 / JP | Representative(s) | Hussain, Deeba, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 120 Moorgate London, EC2M 6UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | Hussain, Deeba, et al Merck & Co., Inc. Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06781147.1 | 11.07.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006JP314122 | Priority number, date | JP20050204264 | 13.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005204264 | [2008/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007007890 | Date: | 18.01.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1914232 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1914232 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/04, A61K31/454, A61P3/04, A61P9/00, A61P9/02, A61P9/10, A61P13/02, A61P19/02, A61P19/06, A61P25/06, A61P25/14, A61P25/16, A61P25/18, A61P25/24, A61P25/28, A61P29/00, A61P43/00 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP,KR);
A61K31/454 (KR);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/02 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | 13.02.2008 | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | N-DIHYDROXYALKYL-SUBSTITUTIERTE 2-OXOIMIDAZOLDERIVATE | [2008/17] | English: | N-DIHYDROXYALKYL-SUBSTITUTED 2-OXOIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES | [2010/25] | French: | DERIVES DU 2-OXOIMIDAZOLE A SUBSTITUTION N-DIHYDROXYALKYLE | [2010/25] |
Former [2008/17] | N-DIHYDROXYALKYL-SUBSTITUTED 2-OXOIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVE | ||
Former [2008/17] | DÉRIVÉ DU 2-OXOIMIDAZOLE À SUBSTITUTION N-DIHYDROXYALKYLE | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2008 | Translation filed | 13.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 10.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.12.2010 | BE | 15.12.2010 | CY | 15.12.2010 | CZ | 15.12.2010 | DK | 15.12.2010 | EE | 15.12.2010 | FI | 15.12.2010 | HU | 15.12.2010 | LT | 15.12.2010 | LV | 15.12.2010 | PL | 15.12.2010 | RO | 15.12.2010 | SE | 15.12.2010 | SI | 15.12.2010 | SK | 15.12.2010 | TR | 15.12.2010 | BG | 15.03.2011 | GR | 16.03.2011 | IS | 15.04.2011 | PT | 15.04.2011 | IE | 11.07.2011 | LU | 11.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
TR | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
IE | 11.07.2011 | ||
LU | 11.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
IE | 11.07.2011 | ||
LU | 11.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
IE | 11.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 15.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [DXY]EP0990653 (BANYU PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [DXY] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0022]; examples 9,10,20,69,70,128; claims 1,17 *; | [Y]WO0139775 (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU], et al) [Y] 1-15* claims 1,19 * |