EP1942541 - FUEL CELL SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REPAIRING ELECTROLYTE FILM THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Motor Company Limited 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [2008/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEKAWA, Toshihiro c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD 560-2,Okatsukoku Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0192 / JP | [2011/42] |
Former [2008/28] | 01 /
TAKEKAWA, Toshihiro c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD 560-2,Okatsukoku Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0192 / JP | Representative(s) | Hager, Thomas Johannes Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Hager, Thomas Johannes Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/28] | Hager, Thomas Johannes Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06781677.7 | 26.07.2006 | [2008/28] | WO2006JP314765 | Priority number, date | JP20050230304 | 09.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005230304 | [2008/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007018035 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1942541 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1942541 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.02.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02, H01M8/04, H01M8/10 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
H01M8/1025 (EP,US);
H01M8/0289 (EP,US);
H01M8/04007 (EP,US);
H01M8/1007 (EP,US);
H01M8/1041 (EP,US);
H01M8/1046 (EP,US);
H01M8/1048 (EP,US);
H01M8/1074 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/28] | H01M8/04, H01M8/02, H01M8/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/44] |
Former [2008/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFZELLENSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM REPARIEREN DESSEN ELEKTROLYTFILMS | [2011/19] | English: | FUEL CELL SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REPAIRING ELECTROLYTE FILM THEREOF | [2008/28] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PILE À COMBUSTIBLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉPARATION D'UN FILM ÉLECTROLYTIQUE DE CELUI-CI | [2011/19] |
Former [2008/28] | BRENNSTOFFZELLENSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM REPARIEREN EINES ELEKTROLYTFILMS DAVON | ||
Former [2008/28] | SYSTÈME À PILE COMBUSTIBLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉPARATION D'UN FILM ÉLECTROLYTIQUE DE CELUI-CI | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2008 | Translation filed | 26.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 11.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2004214089 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-25* abstract *; | [A]WO2004082813 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-25 * page 6, lines 1-28 * * page 7, line 29 - page 8, line 29 * * claims 1,7 *; | [A]US2004224203 (BHAMIDIPATI MURTY V [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0034] * * claims 1,12,15,25,28 *; | [A]JP2005026150 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-25 * abstract *; | [A]JP2005044658 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-25 * abstract * |