EP2048558 - PROGRAM CREATING DEVICE AND PROGRAM CREATING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJINO, Daisuke c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
IRIGUCHI, Kenji c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI, Nobuyuki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
TANAKA, Katsunori c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 05 /
MITANI, Yuka c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2012/39] |
Former [2009/16] | 01 /
FUJINO, Daisuke c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
02 /
IRIGUCHI, Kenji c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
03 /
TAKAHASHI, Nobuyuki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
04 /
TANAKA, Katsunori c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
05 /
MITANI, Yuka c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/16] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06782088.6 | 01.08.2006 | [2009/16] | WO2006JP315210 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008015737 | Date: | 07.02.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2048558 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2048558 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/4093, G05B19/4097 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
G05B19/4097 (EP,US);
G05B2219/35114 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36263 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36265 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36282 (EP,US);
Y02P90/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2009/36] |
Former [2009/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PROGRAMMIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND PROGRAMMIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2009/16] | English: | PROGRAM CREATING DEVICE AND PROGRAM CREATING METHOD | [2009/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CRÉATION DE PROGRAMME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CRÉATION DE PROGRAMME | [2009/16] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2007 | Translation filed | 06.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2007 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 03.03.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1087277 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A] - LEE Y-S ET AL, "USING VIRTUAL BOUNDARIES FOR THE PLANNING AND MACHINING OF PROTRUSION FREE-FORM FEATURES", COMPUTERS IN INDUSTRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19941201), vol. 25, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0166-3615(94)90047-7, ISSN 0166-3615, pages 173 - 186, XP000487083 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0166-3615(94)90047-7 |