EP1914422 - DRIVE DEVICE, LENS BARREL, IMAGING DEVICE, LENS DRIVE METHOD, AND METHOD OF PRODUCING SHAPE MEMORY ALLOY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konica Minolta Opto, Inc. 2970 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8505 / JP | [2008/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRATA, Saori; c/o Konica Minolta Opto, Inc. 2970, Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 1928505 / JP | 02 /
OHTSUKA, Katsumi;c/o Konica Minolta Opto, Inc. 2970, Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 1928505 / JP | 03 /
NEMOTO, Chie; c/o Konica Minolta Opto, Inc. 2970, Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 1928505 / JP | 04 /
TSUCHIYA, Kenpo; c/o Konica Minolta Opto, Inc. 2970, Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 1928505 / JP | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | Garkisch, Marcus Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Garkisch, Marcus Patentanwälte Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/17] | Roberts, Mark Peter J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06782130.6 | 02.08.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006JP315261 | Priority number, date | JP20050232920 | 11.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005232920 | JP20050239758 | 22.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005239758 | JP20050265023 | 13.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005265023 | [2008/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007018086 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1914422 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F03G7/06, C22C19/03, G02B7/08 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
F03G7/065 (EP,US);
G02B7/04 (KR);
F03G7/06143 (KR);
G02B13/001 (EP,KR,US);
G02B7/023 (EP,KR,US);
G02B7/08 (KR);
G03B3/10 (EP,US);
G03B30/00 (KR);
H04N23/55 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2008/37] |
Former [2008/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG, LINSENTUBUS, ABBILDUNGSVORRICHTUNG, LINSENANTRIEBSVERFAHREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER FORMGEDÄCHTNISLEGIERUNG | [2008/17] | English: | DRIVE DEVICE, LENS BARREL, IMAGING DEVICE, LENS DRIVE METHOD, AND METHOD OF PRODUCING SHAPE MEMORY ALLOY | [2008/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF D ENTRAÎNEMENT, BARILLET DE LENTILLE, DISPOSITIF D IMAGERIE, PROCÉDÉ D EXCITATION DE LENTILLE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D ALLIAGE A MÉMOIRE DE FORME | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2008 | Translation filed | 08.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 12.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 10.03.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |