|
11.05.2022 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2022 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2022 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
11 |
|
31.03.2022 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
10 |
|
31.03.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.01.2022 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.01.2022 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
5 |
|
31.01.2022 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
5 |
|
31.01.2022 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.12.2021 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.09.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2021 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2021 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
78 |
|
13.09.2021 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2021 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2021 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2021 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2021 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2021 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
84 |
|
13.09.2021 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
84 |
|
13.09.2021 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
84 |
|
12.05.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.05.2021 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2021 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.03.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.03.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.03.2021 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.03.2021 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2020 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2020 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.2020 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2020 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.2020 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2020 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2020 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
10.07.2020 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Opposition |
23 |
|
10.07.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2020 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.05.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.05.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
14.04.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2020 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
8 |
|
09.03.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
8 |
|
09.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2020 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.03.2020 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.03.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.03.2020 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.03.2020 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.01.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.12.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
9 |
|
30.12.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.12.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
8 |
|
30.12.2019 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.12.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.12.2019 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
17.12.2019 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
17.12.2019 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
18.11.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.09.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.09.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.09.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.09.2019 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2019 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.06.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
33 |
|
15.02.2019 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2018 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2018 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
26.11.2018 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
32 |
|
26.11.2018 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
33 |
|
26.11.2018 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
15.10.2018 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2018 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2018 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.08.2018 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
23.03.2018 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
81 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
30 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
33 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.01.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.12.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
13.11.2017 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2017 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
75 |
|
13.11.2017 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
40 |
|
13.11.2017 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.11.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2017 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.11.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.11.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2017 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2017 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.08.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2017 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.11.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.11.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2016 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.11.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.11.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2016 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2016 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.11.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.10.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.09.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
81 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.07.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.07.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2016 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2015 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
182 |
|
24.07.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
24.07.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
24.07.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
24.07.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
24.07.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
24.07.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
24.07.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
82 |
|
24.07.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
86 |
|
24.07.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
23.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
25 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2013 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.08.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2013 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
108 |
|
08.07.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.07.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.07.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
08.07.2013 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
08.07.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2013 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
108 |
|
04.02.2013 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
12.12.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
31.08.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.11.2011 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2011 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2011 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.10.2011 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
17.09.2008 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
18.08.2008 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.07.2008 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2008 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
21.07.2008 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
21.07.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
100 |
|
21.07.2008 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.07.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.06.2008 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
20.08.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
20.08.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
02.08.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2007 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2007 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
108 |