EP1918811 - MEDIA PROCESSING METHOD AND MEDIA PROCESSING PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Socionext Inc. 10-23, Shinyokohama 2-chome Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222-0033 / JP | [2015/27] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/19] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUMIDA, Kiyohiko c/o Matsushita El. Ind. Co. Ltd. IPROC, 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
ODANI, Kensuke c/o Matsushita El. Ind. Co. Ltd. IPROC, 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
KOGA, Yoshihiro c/o Matsushita El. Ind. Co. Ltd. IPROC, 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
MOROHASHI, Takaharu c/o Matsushita El. Ind. Co. Ltd. IPROC, 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2008/19] | Representative(s) | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | ||
Former [2008/19] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 06782623.0 | 10.08.2006 | [2008/19] | WO2006JP315819 | Priority number, date | JP20050243326 | 24.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005243326 | [2008/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007023683 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1918811 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [2008/19] | CPC: |
G06F9/5038 (EP,US);
G06F9/541 (EP,US);
G06F9/545 (EP,US);
H04N21/443 (EP,US);
G06F2209/5017 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/52] |
Former [2008/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MEDIA-VERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND MEDIA-VERARBEITUNGSPROGRAMM | [2008/19] | English: | MEDIA PROCESSING METHOD AND MEDIA PROCESSING PROGRAM | [2008/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME DE TRAITEMENT DE MÉDIA | [2008/19] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2008 | Translation filed | 01.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 26.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.01.2017 | 27.01.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/26] | 18.02.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2001037408 (THRIFT PHILIP R [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * abstract * * page 1, paragraphs 2,14,16-19 * * page 2, paragraphs 20-40 * * page 3, paragraphs 41-48 *; | [X]US2002147854 (FRAZIER BRIAN EDWARD [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * page 3, paragraphs 39-42 * * page 4, paragraphs 43-47 * * figure 4 *; | [A] - ZIMMERMANN H, "OSI REFERENCE MODEL - THE ISO MODEL OF ARCHITECTURE FOR OPEN SYSTEMS INTERCONNECTION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19800401), vol. COM-28, no. 4, ISSN 0090-6778, pages 425 - 432, XP000814440 [A] 1-23 * pages 426-427 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCOM.1980.1094702 | [A] - ARAKAWA H ET AL, "Software architecture for flexible and extensible image decoding", SIGNAL PROCESSING. IMAGE COMMUNICATION, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19970701), vol. 10, no. 1-3, ISSN 0923-5965, pages 235 - 248, XP004082709 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0923-5965(97)00026-X |