EP1955767 - PHOTOCATALYST-CONTAINING ORGANIC MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2010 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | [2008/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORIUCHI, Nobuhiko c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 02 /
NABETA, Takashi c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 03 /
MIYAZOE, Satoru c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 06782664.4 | 10.08.2006 | [2008/33] | WO2006JP315878 | Priority number, date | JP20050287643 | 30.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005287643 | [2008/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007039984 | Date: | 12.04.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1955767 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01J35/02, B01J35/10, C08K9/02, C08L101/00 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
B01J35/39 (EP,US);
B01J21/06 (KR);
B01J31/06 (EP,US);
B01J35/00 (KR);
B01J37/0215 (EP,US);
B01J37/0244 (EP,US);
C08K9/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08L101/00 (KR);
C02F2305/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2009/01] |
Former [2008/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHOTOKATALYSATOR ENTHALTENDES ORGANISCHES MATERIAL | [2008/33] | English: | PHOTOCATALYST-CONTAINING ORGANIC MATERIAL | [2008/33] | French: | MATIERE ORGANIQUE CONTENANT UN PHOTOCATALYSEUR | [2008/33] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2008 | Translation filed | 21.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2008 | Search fee paid | 21.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 03.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.12.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |