EP1915826 - VIRTUAL MULTIPLE ANTENNA METHOD FOR OFDM SYSTEM AND OFDM-BASED CELLULAR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute 161, Gajeong-dong Yusong-gu Daejeon-city 305-350 / KR | For all designated states Chung-Ang University Industry-Academy Cooperation Foundation 221 Heukseok-dong Dongjak-gu Seoul 155-756 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/18] | For all designated states ELECTRONICS AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH INSTITUTE 161, Gajeong-dong Yusong-gu Daejeon-city 305-350 / KR | ||
For all designated states Chung-Ang University Industry-Academy Cooperation Foundation 221 Heukseok-dong Dongjak-gu Seoul 155-756 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Hyo-Jin 190-12 Gamsam-dong, Dalseo-gu Daegu-city 704-150 / KR | 02 /
AHN, Jae-Young 105-1203 Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong, Yusong-gu Daejeon-city 305-761 / KR | 03 /
CHO, Yong-Soo 25-1006 Shinbanpo3-cha Apt. 1-1 Banpo-dong, Seocho-gu Seoul 137-040 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Kyu-In 170-12 Heukseok-dong, Dongjak-gu Seoul 156-070 / KR | 05 /
PARK, Kyung-Won Rm. 201, 186-2 Heukseok-dong, Dongjak-gu Seoul 156-070 / KR | [2008/18] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/18] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06783653.6 | 18.08.2006 | [2008/18] | WO2006KR03247 | Priority number, date | KR20050076463 | 19.08.2005 Original published format: KR 20050076463 | KR20050081778 | 02.09.2005 Original published format: KR 20050081778 | KR20060074792 | 08.08.2006 Original published format: KR 20060074792 | [2008/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007021153 | Date: | 22.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1915826 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.02.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04L27/26, H04L25/03 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
H04B7/068 (EP,US);
H04L25/03159 (EP,US);
H04L27/2602 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03414 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03522 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03605 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/18] | H04B7/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN VIRTUELLER MEHRERER ANTENNEN FÜR EIN OFDM-SYSTEM UND ZELLULARSYSTEM AUF OFDM-BASIS | [2008/18] | English: | VIRTUAL MULTIPLE ANTENNA METHOD FOR OFDM SYSTEM AND OFDM-BASED CELLULAR SYSTEM | [2008/18] | French: | PROCEDE A ANTENNES MULTIPLES VIRTUEL POUR SYSTEME OFDM ET SYSTEME CELLULAIRE BASE SUR OFDM | [2008/18] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 06.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/18] | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/04] | 08.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2004019447 (ZYRAY WIRELESS INC [US]) [Y] 1-44 * page 6, lines 22-26 * * page 11, lines 8-12 * * figure 6 *; | [Y]US2004114618 (TONG WEN [CA], et al) [Y] 1,6,23,29,44 * page 4 - paragraph 46 * * figures 8A,8B *; | [Y]US2005002325 (GIANNAKIS GEORGIOS B [US], et al) [Y] 1-44 * page 1, paragraph 6 * * page 2, paragraph 22 * * figure 4; claims 1,25 *; | [Y]US2005074071 (PAPATHANASIOU APOSTOLOS [GR], et al) [Y] 1,6,23,29,44 * page 1, paragraphs 10-11 * * page 4, paragraph 69 *; | [A] - CHAE-HYUN LIM ET AL, "Channel capacity enhancement using virtual array elements in smart antenna systems", PROCEEDINGS OF IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS - 28 APRIL-2 MAY 2002 - NEW YORK, NY, USA, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20020428), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/ICC.2002.996836, ISBN 978-0-7803-7400-3, pages 155 - 159, XP010589477 [A] 1-44 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.2002.996836 | International search | [A]US2005002325 (GIANNAKIS GEORGIOS B [US], et al); | [A] - HYUNSEOK YU ET AL., "Transmit selection diversity technique in the MIMO-OFDM systems for HSDPA", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 2003. VTC 2004-SPRING. 2004 IEEE 59TH, (20040517), vol. 1, pages 362 - 366, XP003008970 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECS.2004.1387975 | [A] - MAHADEVAPPA R. AND TEN BRINK S., "Rate-feedback schemes for MIMO-OFDM wireless LANs", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 2003. VTC2004-FALL. 2004 IEEE 60TH, (20040926), vol. 1, pages 563 - 567, XP010788439 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECF.2004.1400070 |