EP1989711 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CASCADE MEMORY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trek 2000 International Ltd 30 Loyang Way No. 07-13/14/15, Loyang Industrial Estate Singapore 508769 / SG | [2008/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POO, Teng Pin Block 108 Rivervale Walk 15-106 Singapore 540108 / SG | [2008/46] | Representative(s) | Finnie, Peter John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Finnie, Peter John Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06784254.2 | 17.08.2006 | [2008/46] | WO2006SG00235 | Priority number, date | SG20060001251 | 27.02.2006 Original published format: SG 200601251 | [2008/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007097712 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1989711 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 30.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G11C7/00, G11C8/00 | [2008/46] | CPC: |
G11C5/04 (EP,US);
G06F13/00 (KR);
G06F7/00 (KR);
G11C7/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR KASKADENSPEICHER | [2008/46] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CASCADE MEMORY | [2008/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR MÉMOIRE EN CASCADE | [2008/46] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 16.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/46] | 30.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/33] | 04.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6379290 (HITACHI VLSI ENG, et al) [X] 1,6* figures 2,4 *; | [X]WO9632724 (CIRRUS LOGIC INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 21; figure 5 * | International search | [X]WO9923662 (NETLOGIC MICROSYSTEMS INC [US], et al); | [X]US5818350 (ESTAKHRI PETRO [US], et al); | [A]US6715044 (LOFGREN KARL M J [US], et al); | [A]US6657914 (ONG ADRIAN E [US], et al) |