EP1888330 - CHEMICAL SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of Minnesota 450 McNamara Alumni Center, 200 Oak Street S. E. Minneapolis, MN 55455-2070 / US | [2008/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUHLMANN, Philippe 2801 43rd Avenue South Minneapolis, MN 55406 / US | 02 /
BOSWELL, Paul, G. 4 Pine Tree Drive, Apt. 321 Arden Hills, MN 55112 / US | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [2009/27] |
Former [2008/08] | Kihn, Pierre Emile Joseph, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 06784476.1 | 26.05.2006 | [2008/08] | WO2006US20366 | Priority number, date | US20050684765P | 26.05.2005 Original published format: US 684765 P | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006127963 | Date: | 30.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1888330 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/02, G01N33/84, G01N27/333 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
G01N33/84 (EP,US);
C12Q1/001 (EP,US);
G01N27/3335 (EP,US);
G01N33/5438 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/08] | B32B5/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/08] | Extension states | AL | 24.12.2007 | BA | 24.12.2007 | HR | 24.12.2007 | MK | 24.12.2007 | YU | 24.12.2007 | Title | German: | CHEMISCHER SENSOR | [2008/08] | English: | CHEMICAL SENSOR | [2008/08] | French: | CAPTEUR CHIMIQUE | [2008/08] | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 24.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 13.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/13] | 17.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004101691 (WHITE WHITNEY [US]) [X] 1-6,8-14,27-29 * claims 1, 17-18 *; | [X] - BUHLMANN PHILIPPE ET AL, "Perfluorinated matrixes as new materials for receptor-doped chemical sensors.", ABSTRACTS OF PAPERS AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, & 229TH NATIONAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-CHEMICAL-SOCIETY; SAN DIEGO, CA, USA; MARCH 13 -17, 2005, (200503), vol. 229, no. Part 1, ISSN 0065-7727, page U143, XP009126896 [X] 1-6,8-29 * the whole document * | [X] - MURPHY B ET AL, "Study of the impact of penetrant characteristics upon diffusion into Teflon membranes to further assess the performance of an ATR/FTIR sensor.", ANALYTICAL AND BIOANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY SEP 2003, (200309), vol. 377, no. 1, ISSN 1618-2642, pages 195 - 202, XP002559923 [X] 1-6,8-14,27-29 * abstract; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00216-003-2079-7 | [A] - JOHNSON R DANIEL ET AL, "Ionophore-based ion-selective potentiometric and optical sensors.", ANALYTICAL AND BIOANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY JUN 2003, (200306), vol. 376, no. 3, ISSN 1618-2642, pages 328 - 341, XP002559924 [A] 1-6,8-29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/S00216-003-1931-0 | [XP] - BOSWELL PAUL G ET AL, "Fluorous bulk membranes for potentiometric sensors with wide selectivity ranges: observation of exceptionally strong ion pair formation.", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY 29 JUN 2005, (20050629), vol. 127, no. 25, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 8958 - 8959, XP002559925 [XP] 1-6,8-29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JA052403A | [XDP] - BOSWELL PAUL G ET AL, "Coordinative properties of highly fluorinated solvents with amino and ether groups.", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY 7 DEC 2005, (20051207), vol. 127, no. 48, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 16976 - 16984, XP002559926 [XDP] 1-6,8-29 * abstract; page 16978, col.1, par.3-col.2, par.1; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JA055816K | International search | [X]US6103033 (SAY JAMES [US], et al); | [X]US5045828 (KULWICKI BERNARD M [US], et al); | [X]US5315673 (STETTER JOSEPH R [US], et al); | [Y]US5110645 (MATSUMOTO JUN [JP], et al) |