EP1976579 - DUAL PURPOSE ACUTE AND HOME TREATMENT DIALYSIS MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renal Solutions, Inc. 770 Commonwealth Drive, Suite 101 Warrendale PA 15086 / US | [2008/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DeCOMO, Peter 202 Crescent Court Cranberry Township, PA 16066 / US | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | Harguth, Alexander Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | [2013/32] |
Former [2009/40] | Harguth, Alexander Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/41] | Harguth, Alexander Fish & Richardson P.C. Regus Business Center Landsberger Strasse 155 80687 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 06784511.5 | 31.05.2006 | [2008/41] | WO2006US21056 | Priority number, date | US20060757052P | 06.01.2006 Original published format: US 757052 P | [2008/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007081384 | Date: | 19.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1976579 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1976579 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/14 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
A61M1/16 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3393 (EP);
A61M2205/502 (EP,US);
A61M2205/505 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIALYSEGERÄT MIT DOPPELTER FUNKTION FÜR DIE AKUTBEHANDLUNG UND DIE BEHANDLUNG ZU HAUSE | [2008/41] | English: | DUAL PURPOSE ACUTE AND HOME TREATMENT DIALYSIS MACHINE | [2008/41] | French: | APPAREIL DE DIALYSE DOUBLE USAGE POUR TRAITEMENT DE COURTE DUREE ET TRAITEMENT A DOMICILE | [2008/41] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 20.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 08.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 06.08.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.09.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.05.2006 | AT | 07.08.2013 | BE | 07.08.2013 | BG | 07.08.2013 | CY | 07.08.2013 | CZ | 07.08.2013 | DK | 07.08.2013 | EE | 07.08.2013 | ES | 07.08.2013 | FI | 07.08.2013 | LT | 07.08.2013 | LV | 07.08.2013 | MC | 07.08.2013 | NL | 07.08.2013 | PL | 07.08.2013 | RO | 07.08.2013 | SI | 07.08.2013 | SK | 07.08.2013 | TR | 07.08.2013 | GR | 08.11.2013 | IS | 07.12.2013 | PT | 09.12.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 31.05.2006 | |
AT | 07.08.2013 | ||
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
BG | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
BG | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
AT | 07.08.2013 | ||
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
AT | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
AT | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
AT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 07.08.2013 | |
PT | 09.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5609770 (ZIMMERMAN ERIC [US], et al) [A] 9-14 * claims 26-30 *; | [A]WO9747336 (ALTHIN MEDICAL AB [SE], et al) [A] 9 * claim 1 *; | [I]US5776345 (TRUITT LORI A [US], et al) [I] 9-14 * column 13, line 17 - line 64; figure 1 *; | [XI]US5863421 (PETER FREDERICK H JR [US], et al) [X] 9,10,12-14 * column 22, line 21 - line 30 * * column 26, line 18 - line 53 * * column 34, line 40 - line 58 * * column 44, line 54 - column 45, line 33 * * figures 6,13 * [I] 11; | [A]EP1576972 (BRAUN MEDIZINTECHNOLOGIE GMBH [DE]) [A] 9* claim 7 * |