EP1893997 - QUANTITATIVE ASSAYS FOR RAS P21 IN BODY FLUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Healthcare Diagnostics Inc. 511 Benedict Avenue Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2008/28] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states Bayer Healthcare LLC Law & Patens Department 511 Benedict Avenue Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARNEY, Walter, P. 14 Bay State Road North Andover, MA 01845 / US | 02 /
HAMER, Peter, J. 25 Dudley Street Reading, MA 01867 / US | 03 /
PIERCE, Karen 3 Heald Road Acton, MA 01720 / US | 04 /
BROWN-SHIMER, Sheryl 14 Rutland Street Boston, MA 02188 / US | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG CT IP Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/10] | Behnisch, Werner Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner GbR Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06785512.2 | 23.06.2006 | [2008/10] | WO2006US24647 | Priority number, date | US20050694082P | 23.06.2005 Original published format: US 694082 P | [2008/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007002505 | Date: | 04.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1893997 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1893997 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/48, G01N33/00, G01N1/00 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
G01N33/5748 (EP,US);
G01N33/574 (US);
G01N2333/82 (EP,US);
G01N2800/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/10] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | QUANTITATIVE ASSAYS FÜR RAS P21 IN KÖRPERFLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2008/10] | English: | QUANTITATIVE ASSAYS FOR RAS P21 IN BODY FLUIDS | [2008/10] | French: | ESSAIS QUANTITATIFS DE RECHERCHE DE RAS P21 DANS LES FLUIDES CORPORELS | [2008/10] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 28.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.08.2010 | BE | 04.08.2010 | CY | 04.08.2010 | CZ | 04.08.2010 | DK | 04.08.2010 | EE | 04.08.2010 | FI | 04.08.2010 | HU | 04.08.2010 | IT | 04.08.2010 | LT | 04.08.2010 | LV | 04.08.2010 | NL | 04.08.2010 | PL | 04.08.2010 | RO | 04.08.2010 | SE | 04.08.2010 | SI | 04.08.2010 | SK | 04.08.2010 | TR | 04.08.2010 | BG | 04.11.2010 | GR | 05.11.2010 | IS | 04.12.2010 | PT | 06.12.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
TR | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0206065 (FERAMISCO JAMES R [US], et al) [X] 1-26 * the whole document * * claim 1 * * example 1 * * page 10, lines 23-25 * * page 11, line 15 - line 20 *; | [X]EP0214520 (ONCOGENE SCIENCE INC [US]) [X] 1-26 * the whole document * * claims 1-104 * * claim 93 * * page 5, line 8 - line 15 * * page 14, line 30 - page 15, line 15 *; | [DX]US5443956 (CARNEY WALTER P [US]) [DX] 1-26 * the whole document * * abstract * * column 6 * * column 8, line 13 - line 24 * * example 7 *; | [A]US2003219842 (CARNEY WALTER P [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * the whole document ** claims 1,9,13,27,43,50 *; | [DX] - RUNDLE ANDREW ET AL, "Association between the ras p21 oncoprotein in blood samples and breast cancer", CANCER LETTERS, (20021108), vol. 185, no. 1, ISSN 0304-3835, pages 71 - 78, XP002486942 [DX] 1-26 * the whole document * * page 72, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 73, column 2 * * table 2 * * page 77, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-3835(02)00236-7 | [A] - FURTH M E ET AL, "MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES TO THE P21 PRODUCTS OF THE TRANSFORMING GENE OF HARVEY MURINE SARCOMA VIRUS AND OF THE CELLULAR RAS GENE FAMILY", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (19820701), vol. 43, no. 1, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 294 - 304, XP008041021 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * * page 301, column 1 * | [A] - GULBIS BEATRICE ET AL, "Immunodetection of the p21-ras products in human normal and preneoplastic tissues and solid tumors: A review", HUMAN PATHOLOGY, (1993), vol. 24, no. 12, ISSN 0046-8177, pages 1271 - 1285, XP002486943 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0046-8177(93)90260-N | International search | [Y] - RUNDLE A. ET AL., "Association between the ras p21 oncoprotein in blood samples and breast cancer", CANCER LETTERS, (2002), vol. 185, pages 71 - 78, XP002486942 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-3835(02)00236-7 | by applicant | - WILHELM ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (20041001), vol. 64, pages 7099 - 7109 |