EP1908324 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR HOME NETWORK SEARCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motorola Mobility LLC 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048-5343 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | For all designated states Motorola Mobility LLC 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | ||
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states Motorola Mobility, Inc. 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | ||
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states Motorola, Inc. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOWELL, Stephen, A. 56 Newstead Road Gloucester Gloucestershire GL4 3TQ / GB | 02 /
DAS, Prashanti 23, Yash Classic Enclave Kapoor Construction P.O. Kalyan Nagar Bangalore, Karnataka 560043 / IN | 03 /
RAMACHANDRA, Srikrishna No. 15 12th Cross 3rd Main Bangalore, Karnataka 560030 / IN | [2014/43] |
Former [2008/15] | 01 /
HOWELL, Stephen, A. 56 Newstead Road Gloucester Gloucestershire GL4 3TQ / GB | ||
02 /
DAS, Prashanti 23, Yash Classic Enclave Kapoor Construction, P.O. Kalyan Nagar Bangalore, Karnataka 560043 / IN | |||
03 /
RAMACHANDRA, Srikrishna No. 15 12th Cross 3rd Main Bangalore, Karnataka 560030 / IN | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2008/15] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 06785524.7 | 23.06.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006US24674 | Priority number, date | IN2005KOL0555 | 24.06.2005 Original published format: IN KO05552005 | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007002524 | Date: | 04.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1908324 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1908324 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/18, // H04W48/16 | [2014/35] | CPC: |
H04W48/18 (EP);
H04W24/00 (KR);
H04W48/16 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/15] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HEIMNETZWERK-SUCHE | [2008/15] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR HOME NETWORK SEARCH | [2008/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR LA RECHERCHE DU RESEAU DE RATTACHEMENT | [2008/15] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 05.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15150895.9 / EP2863685 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.06.2006 | AT | 11.03.2015 | BE | 11.03.2015 | BG | 11.03.2015 | CY | 11.03.2015 | CZ | 11.03.2015 | DK | 11.03.2015 | EE | 11.03.2015 | ES | 11.03.2015 | FI | 11.03.2015 | IT | 11.03.2015 | LT | 11.03.2015 | LV | 11.03.2015 | MC | 11.03.2015 | PL | 11.03.2015 | RO | 11.03.2015 | SE | 11.03.2015 | SI | 11.03.2015 | SK | 11.03.2015 | TR | 11.03.2015 | GR | 12.06.2015 | IE | 23.06.2015 | LU | 23.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | IS | 11.07.2015 | PT | 13.07.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/37] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
BE | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IE | 23.06.2015 | ||
LU | 23.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IE | 23.06.2015 | ||
LU | 23.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IE | 23.06.2015 | ||
LU | 23.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
LU | 23.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 11.03.2015 | |
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 11.03.2015 | |
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 11.03.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005107082 (GUNARATNAM JAYASRI [CA], et al) [X] 1-19 * paragraphs [0008] , [0010] , [0018] , [0052] , [0053] , [0057] - [0059] * * figure 6 *; | [X]US2002119774 (JOHANNESSON REGINA [SE], et al) [X] 1-19 * paragraphs [0004] , [0006] , [0016] , [0019] , [0020] * * figures 4,5 *; | [A] - "Non-Access-Stratum (NAS) functions related to Mobile Station (MS) in idle mode", 3GPP TS 23.122 V7.2.0, (20050615), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/archive/23_series/23.122/23122-720.zip, (20060926), XP002400554 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2005107082 | US2002119774 |