EP1902358 - NEURAL MODELING AND BRAIN-BASED DEVICES USING SPECIAL PURPOSE PROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neurosciences Research Foundation Inc. 10640 John Jay Hopkins Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2008/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SNOOK, James, A. 4874 Monongahela Street San Diego, California 92117 / US | 02 /
HUTSON, Donald, B. 1211 Opal Street San Diego, California 92109 / US | 03 /
KRICHMAR, Jeffrey, L. 1824 Somerset Avenue Cardiff-by-the-sea, California 92007 / US | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2008/13] | Ketelaars, Maarten F.J.M. Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 06785790.4 | 28.06.2006 | [2008/13] | WO2006US25264 | Priority number, date | US20050694532P | 28.06.2005 Original published format: US 694532 P | US20060426881 | 27.06.2006 Original published format: US 426881 | [2008/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007002790 | Date: | 04.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1902358 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.05.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/063 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
G06N3/063 (EP,US);
G06N3/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/26] | G06F15/18 | ||
Former IPC [2008/13] | G06F9/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/13] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUF NEURONALER MODELLIERUNG UND DEM HIRN BASIERENDE EINRICHTUNGEN MIT SPEZIELLEM PROZESSOR | [2008/13] | English: | NEURAL MODELING AND BRAIN-BASED DEVICES USING SPECIAL PURPOSE PROCESSOR | [2008/13] | French: | MODELISATION NEURONALE ET DISPOSITIF FONDEE SUR LE CERVEAU UTILISANT UN PROCESSEUR SPECIAL | [2008/13] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 24.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 24.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/52] | 30.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - JEFFREY L KRICHMAR AND GERALD M EDELMAN, "Machine Psychology: Autonomous Behavior, Perceptual Categorization and Conditioning in a Brain-based Device", CEREBRAL CORTEX, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, (20020801), vol. 12, no. 8, pages 818 - 830, XP002574000 [X] 1,4,18-22 * page 1 - page 827 * * page 829 - page 830 * [I] 2,3,5-7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/cercor/12.8.818 | [AD] - SETH K ET AL, "Visual Binding Through Reentrant Connectivity and Dynamic Synchronization in a Brain-based Device", CEREBRAL CORTEX, PLENUM PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1093/CERCOR/BHH079, (20041101), ISSN 1566-6816, pages 1185 - 1199, XP007910265 [AD] 1-7,18-22 * page 1185 - page 1198 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/cercor/bhh079 | [XI] - GLACKIN B ET AL, A Novel Approach for the Implementation of Large Scale Spiking Neural Networks on FPGA Hardware, COMPUTATIONAL INTELLIGENCE AND BIOINSPIRED SYSTEMS; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS], SPRINGER-VERLAG, BERLIN/HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 552 - 563, (20050618), ISBN 9783540262084, XP019010321 [X] 1-3,18,20 * page 552 - page 561 * [I] 4-7,19,21,22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/11494669_68 | [XI] - HELLMICH H H ET AL, "An FPGA based simulation acceleration platform for spiking neural networks", IEEE INTERNATIONAL MIDWEST SYMPOSIUM,, (20040725), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-8346-3, pages II_389 - II_392, XP010738756 [X] 1-3,18,20 * the whole document * [I] 4-7,19,21,22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MWSCAS.2004.1354175 | [XI] - DIETMAR JUNG ET AL, "Synaptic plasticity in spiking neural networks (SP<2>INN): a system approach", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NEURAL NETWORKS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US LNKD- DOI:10.1109/TNN.2003.816060, (20030901), vol. 14, no. 5, ISSN 1045-9227, pages 980 - 992, XP011103251 [X] 1-3,18,20 * page 980 - page 991, column l * [I] 4-7,19,21,22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TNN.2003.816060 | [XI] - ROGGEN D ET AL, "Hardware spiking neural network with run-time reconfigurable connectivity in an autonomous robot", EVOLVABLE HARDWARE, 2003. PROCEEDINGS. NASA/DOD CONFERENCE ON JULY 9-11, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20030709), ISBN 978-0-7695-1977-7, pages 199 - 208, XP010648230 [X] 1-3,18,20 * page 1 - page 9 * [I] 4-7,19,21,22 | [XI] - TIM SCHOENAUER ET AL, "NeuroPipe-Chip: A Digital Neuro-Processor for Spiking Neural Networks", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NEURAL NETWORKS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20020101), vol. 13, no. 1, ISSN 1045-9227, XP011039731 [X] 1-3,18,20 * page 205 - page 212 * [I] 4-7,19,21,22 | International search | [X]US5164826 (DAILEY GEORGE F [US]); | [Y]US2003033032 (LIND MICHAEL A [US], et al); | [Y]US4095367 (OGAWA IWAKICHI) | [X] - HALGAMUGE ET AL., "Fuzzy Interpretable Dynamically Developing Neural Networks with FPGA Based Implementation.", IEEE Proceedings of the Fourth International Conference on Microelectronics for Neural Networks and Fuzzy Systems. 26-28 September 1994, pages 226 - 234, XP010222657 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICMNN.1994.593714 | [Y] - MILLER, W.T., "III. Real-time Neural Network Control of a Biped Walking Robot.", IEEE CONTROL SYSTEMS MAGAZINE., (199402), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 41 - 48, XP008125042 |