EP1904639 - DEHYDRIN GENES AND PROMOTERS FROM COFFEE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | For all designated states CORNELL RESEARCH FOUNDATION, INC. 20 Thornwood Drive, Suite 105 Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | [2008/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANKSLEY, Steven D. 17 Bridle Lane Dryden, NY 13053 / US | 02 /
LIN, Chenwei 600 Warren Rd, 4-3a Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | 03 /
BEN AMOR, Mohamed Avenue Nestle 55 Tn-tebag-korba, XX 8070 / TN | 04 /
MCCARTHY, James Gerard 298 Vallee De Vautruchot F-37210 Noizay XX / FR | 05 /
PETIARD, Vincent 28 Allee Cote Fleurie F-37100 Tours XX / FR | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | Cogniat, Eric, et al Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Cogniat, Eric Jean Marie, et al Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | ||
Former [2008/14] | Lomholt, Stig Bredsted Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 06786395.1 | 05.07.2006 | [2008/14] | WO2006US26234 | Priority number, date | US20050696890P | 06.07.2005 Original published format: US 696890 P | [2008/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007005980 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1904639 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1904639 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
C12N15/8234 (EP,US);
C07K14/415 (EP,US);
C12N15/8273 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/14] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DEHYDRINGENE UND PROMOTOREN AUS KAFFEE | [2008/14] | English: | DEHYDRIN GENES AND PROMOTERS FROM COFFEE | [2008/14] | French: | GENES DE DESHYDRINE ET PROMOTEURS PROPRES AU CAFE | [2008/14] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 16.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.03.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 13.03.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.05.2010 | BE | 05.05.2010 | CZ | 05.05.2010 | DK | 05.05.2010 | EE | 05.05.2010 | LT | 05.05.2010 | LV | 05.05.2010 | PL | 05.05.2010 | RO | 05.05.2010 | SE | 05.05.2010 | SI | 05.05.2010 | SK | 05.05.2010 | TR | 05.05.2010 | CY | 26.05.2010 | IE | 05.07.2010 | LU | 05.07.2010 | CH | 31.07.2010 | LI | 31.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | BG | 05.08.2010 | GR | 06.08.2010 | IS | 05.09.2010 | PT | 06.09.2010 | HU | 06.11.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
BG | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
TR | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.07.2010 | ||
LU | 05.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
HU | 06.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
BG | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.07.2010 | ||
LU | 05.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
HU | 06.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
BG | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
HU | 06.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
BG | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0177384 (EPIGENOMICS AG [DE], et al) [X] 10 * sequences 25203,17545,207467 *; | [XA]WO03027249 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,5-39,41-47 * claim 1; sequence 34 * [A] 4; | [PX]WO2005122697 (UNIV CARMEL HAIFA ECONOMIC COR [IL], et al) [PX] 1-3,5-39,41-47 * claims 1-13 *; | [XA] - KASUGA MIE ET AL, "A combination of the Arabidopsis DREB1A gene and stress-inducible rd29A promoter improved drought- and low-temperature stress tolerance in tobacco by gene transfer.", PLANT & CELL PHYSIOLOGY MAR 2004, (200403), vol. 45, no. 3, ISSN 0032-0781, pages 346 - 350, XP002421281 [X] 1-3,5-39,41-47 * sequences NTERD10B, AC AB049336 * [A] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/pcp/pch037 | [XA] - FERNANDEZ DIANA ET AL, "Coffee (Coffea arabica L.) genes early expressed during infection by the rust fungus (Hemileia vastatrix)", MOLECULAR PLANT PATHOLOGY, (200411), vol. 5, no. 6, ISSN 1464-6722, pages 527 - 536, XP002421282 [X] 1-3,5-39,41-47 * page 532; table 2 * [A] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1364-3703.2004.00250.x | [XA] - KAYE CLAUDIA ET AL, "Characterization of a gene for spinach CAP160 and expression of two spinach cold-acclimation proteins in tobacco", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY (ROCKVILLE), (199804), vol. 116, no. 4, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 1367 - 1377, XP002421536 [X] 1-3,5-39,41-47 * the whole document * [A] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.116.4.1367 | [A] - BRETON G ET AL, "Biotechnological applications of plant freezing associated proteins.", BIOTECHNOLOGY ANNUAL REVIEW 2000, (2000), vol. 6, ISSN 1387-2656, pages 59 - 101, XP001062997 [A] 1-39,41-47 * page 85 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1387-2656(00)06019-1 | [A] - ALLAGULOVA CH R ET AL, "The plant dehydrins: structure and putative functions.", BIOCHEMISTRY. BIOKHIMII A SEP 2003, (200309), vol. 68, no. 9, ISSN 0006-2979, pages 945 - 951, XP009079176 [A] 1-39,41-47 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1026077825584 | [A] - WISE MICHAEL J ET AL, "POPP the question: What do LEA proteins do?", TRENDS IN PLANT SCIENCE, (200401), vol. 9, no. 1, ISSN 1360-1385, pages 13 - 17, XP002421537 [A] 1-39,41-47 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tplants.2003.10.012 | [PX] - CHENWEI LIN ET AL, "Coffee and tomato share common gene repertoires as revealed by deep sequencing of seed and cherry transcripts", THEORETICAL AND APPLIED GENETICS ; INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PLANT BREEDING RESEARCH, SPRINGER-VERLAG, BE, (20051201), vol. 112, no. 1, ISSN 1432-2242, pages 114 - 130, XP019322122 [PX] 1-39,41-47 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00122-005-0112-2 | [PX] - HINNIGER CÉCILE ET AL, "Isolation and characterization of cDNA encoding three dehydrins expressed during Coffea canephora (Robusta) grain development.", ANNALS OF BOTANY MAY 2006, (200605), vol. 97, no. 5, ISSN 0305-7364, pages 755 - 765, XP009079141 [PX] 1-39,41-47 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/aob/mcl032 | [X] - SATOS ET AL, "Structural analysis of arabidopsis thaliana chromosome 3. I. Sequence features of the regions of 4,504,864 bp covered by sixty P1 and TAC clones", GENBANK, (20000428), XP002974277 [X] 1-32 * sequence Q9LT74 * |