EP1912946 - PYRIDINE DERIVATIVES AS DIPEPTEDYL PEPTIDASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis IN 46285 / US | ||
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Eli Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLASZCZAK, Larry, Chris 1327 Broadway Street Indianapolis, IN 46202 / US | 02 /
MATHES, Brian, Michael 7840 Fawnwood Drive Indianapolis, IN 46278 / US | 03 /
PULLEY, Shon, Roland 21800 Schulley Road Noblesville, IN 46062 / US | 04 /
ROBERTSON, Michael, Alan 7567 Chatterton Drive Indianapolis, IN 46254 / US | 05 /
SHEEHAN, Scott, Martin 12589 Sandstone Run Carmel, IN 46033 / US | 06 /
SHI, Qing 3563 Corsham Circle Carmel, IN 46032 / US | 07 /
WATSON, Brian, Morgan 3816 Brian Place Carmel, IN 46033 / US | 08 /
WILEY, Michael, Robert 6851 Woodhaven Place Zionsville, IN 46077 / US | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | Smith, Andrew George, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited 8 Arlington Square West Downshire Way Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 1PU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | Smith, Andrew George, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited European Patent Operations Lilly Research Centre Erl Wood Manor Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06787379.4 | 14.07.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006US27465 | Priority number, date | US20050700873P | 20.07.2005 Original published format: US 700873 P | [2008/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007015767 | Date: | 08.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1912946 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1912946 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/38, C07D213/82, A61K31/44, A61P3/10 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
C07D213/82 (EP,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
C07D213/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PYRIDINDERIVATE ALS DIPEPTEDYL-PEPTIDASE-HEMMER | [2008/17] | English: | PYRIDINE DERIVATIVES AS DIPEPTEDYL PEPTIDASE INHIBITORS | [2008/17] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE PYRIDINE EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE DIPEPTEDYL PEPTIDASE | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 28.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.05.2009 | BE | 27.05.2009 | CY | 27.05.2009 | CZ | 27.05.2009 | DK | 27.05.2009 | EE | 27.05.2009 | FI | 27.05.2009 | LT | 27.05.2009 | LV | 27.05.2009 | NL | 27.05.2009 | PL | 27.05.2009 | RO | 27.05.2009 | SI | 27.05.2009 | SK | 27.05.2009 | TR | 27.05.2009 | IE | 14.07.2009 | LU | 14.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | BG | 27.08.2009 | SE | 27.08.2009 | GR | 28.08.2009 | IS | 27.09.2009 | PT | 27.09.2009 | HU | 28.11.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
IE | 14.07.2009 | ||
LU | 14.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
HU | 28.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
IE | 14.07.2009 | ||
LU | 14.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
IE | 14.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/42] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
IE | 14.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO03068757 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [DA] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004103276 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-28* the whole document * |