EP1906887 - ANTIMICROBIAL CONTAINMENT CAP FOR A BONE ANCHORED PROSTHESIS MOUNTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Utah Research Foundation 615 Arapeen Drive, Suite 310 Salt Lake City, UT 84108 / US | For all designated states Olsen, Raymond E. 791 Canyon Terrace Smithfield, UT 84335 / US | [2015/47] |
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states University of Utah Research Foundation 615 Arapeen Drive, Suite 310 Salt Lake City, UT 84108 / US | ||
For all designated states Olsen, Raymond E. 791 Canyon Terrace Smithfield, UT UT 84335 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLSEN, Raymond, E. 791 Canyon Terrace Smithfield, UT 84335 / US | 02 /
BLOEBAUM, Roy, D. 2052 South Lakeline Drive Salt Lake City, UT 84109 / US | 03 /
BACHUS, Kent, N. 4638 South Stockbridge Lane Salt Lake City, UT 84117 / US | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Ruschke, Hans Edvard Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/47] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/36] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/15] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06787921.3 | 19.07.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006US28115 | Priority number, date | US20050701229P | 20.07.2005 Original published format: US 701229 P | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007013948 | Date: | 01.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1906887 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1906887 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/78, // A61F2/28, A61F2/30 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
A61F2/78 (EP,US);
A61F2/2814 (EP,US);
A61F2/30749 (EP,US);
A61F2002/2825 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30225 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30235 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30354 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30507 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30677 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3068 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30785 (EP,US);
A61F2002/7887 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0025 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0033 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0069 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0068 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/15] | A61F2/80 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/47] |
Former [2008/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTIMIKROBIELLE SICHERHEITSKAPPE FÜR EIN PROTHESENMONTAGESYSTEM MIT KNOCHENVERANKERUNG | [2008/15] | English: | ANTIMICROBIAL CONTAINMENT CAP FOR A BONE ANCHORED PROSTHESIS MOUNTING SYSTEM | [2008/15] | French: | CAPUCHON DE CONFINEMENT ANTIMICROBIEN DESTINE A UN SYSTEME DE MONTAGE DE PROTHESE FIXE A UN OS | [2008/15] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 16.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.07.2006 | AT | 18.11.2015 | BE | 18.11.2015 | BG | 18.11.2015 | CY | 18.11.2015 | CZ | 18.11.2015 | DK | 18.11.2015 | EE | 18.11.2015 | ES | 18.11.2015 | FI | 18.11.2015 | IT | 18.11.2015 | LT | 18.11.2015 | LV | 18.11.2015 | MC | 18.11.2015 | NL | 18.11.2015 | PL | 18.11.2015 | RO | 18.11.2015 | SE | 18.11.2015 | SI | 18.11.2015 | SK | 18.11.2015 | TR | 18.11.2015 | GR | 19.02.2016 | IS | 18.03.2016 | PT | 18.03.2016 | GB | 19.07.2016 | IE | 19.07.2016 | LU | 19.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | FR | 01.08.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 19.07.2006 | |
AT | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
TR | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
GB | 19.07.2016 | ||
IE | 19.07.2016 | ||
LU | 19.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 19.07.2006 | |
AT | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
GB | 19.07.2016 | ||
IE | 19.07.2016 | ||
LU | 19.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
GB | 19.07.2016 | ||
IE | 19.07.2016 | ||
LU | 19.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
GB | 19.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
LT | 18.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE202004014043U (ESKA IMPLANTS GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *[A] 3-20 | International search | [Y]US3947897 (OWENS LESTER J); | [Y]US5662715 (SLEMKER TRACY C [US]); | [Y]US5888216 (HABERMAN LOUIS J [US]) |