EP1910599 - A METHOD OF MAKING POROUS SELF-COHERED WEB MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gore Enterprise Holdings, Inc. 551 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206 Newark, DE 19714-9206 / US | [2008/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARNSWORTH, Ted, R. 628 N. Pine Cliff Dr. Flagstaff, AZ 86001 / US | 02 /
FLYNN, Charles 2600 N. Valley View Rd. 111 Flagstaff, AZ 86004 / US | 03 /
WHITE, Charles, F. 603 Azure Drive Camp Verde, AZ 86322 / US | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk Scotland 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | ||
Former [2008/16] | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 06788200.1 | 21.07.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006US28503 | Priority number, date | US20050192744 | 29.07.2005 Original published format: US 192744 | [2008/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007015986 | Date: | 08.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1910599 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1910599 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/42, D04H3/16, A61L31/14 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
D04H3/16 (EP,US);
A61L27/52 (EP,US);
A61L27/56 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/16] | D04H1/42, D04H3/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG PORÖSER SELBSTGEBUNDENER STOFFBAHNMATERIALIEN | [2008/16] | English: | A METHOD OF MAKING POROUS SELF-COHERED WEB MATERIALS | [2008/16] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE MATIERES EN TOILE POREUSE A AUTO-ADHESION | [2008/16] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 06.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 24.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12000083.1 / EP2489769 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.07.2006 | AT | 11.01.2012 | BE | 11.01.2012 | CY | 11.01.2012 | CZ | 11.01.2012 | DK | 11.01.2012 | EE | 11.01.2012 | FI | 11.01.2012 | LT | 11.01.2012 | LV | 11.01.2012 | NL | 11.01.2012 | PL | 11.01.2012 | RO | 11.01.2012 | SE | 11.01.2012 | SI | 11.01.2012 | SK | 11.01.2012 | TR | 11.01.2012 | BG | 11.04.2012 | GR | 12.04.2012 | IS | 11.05.2012 | PT | 11.05.2012 | LU | 21.07.2012 | CH | 31.07.2012 | LI | 31.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
LU | 21.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | SI | 11.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0647734 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 2, lines 5-6, 57; claim - *; | [A]EP0835894 (INST TEXTIL & FASERFORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2, lines 3-10,20-22; claims 5,8 *; | [A]US5824335 (DORIGATTI FRANCO [IT], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [AD]US6165217 (HAYES BYRON K [US]) [AD] 1-11 * column 6, line 58 - column 8, line 64; figure -; example - * * column 18, line 10 - column 19, line 27 * * column 22, line 59 - column 223, line 5 *; | [E]WO2007015970 (GORE ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [E] 1-11 * page 4, lines 12-15; figure -; example - * * page 11, line 3 - page 12, line 13 * | International search | [Y]US5730821 (JOEST ROLF HELMUT [DE], et al); | [Y]US5833787 (EHRET PHILIPPE [FR], et al); | [Y]US5851937 (WU PAI-CHUAN [US], et al); | [Y]US6113640 (TOERMAELAE PERTTI [FI], et al); | [Y]US6267782 (OGLE MATTHEW F [US], et al); | [Y]US2003088924 (BOLIEK JOHN E [US]) |