EP1908128 - STRUCTURE FOR IMPROVED HIGH CRITICAL CURRENT DENSITIES IN YBCO COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Los Alamos National Security, LLC Los Alamos National Laboratory LC/IP, MS A187 Los Alamos, NM 87545 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states Los Alamos National Security, LLC Los Alamos National Laboratory, LC/IP MS A187 Los Alamos, NM 87545 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOLTYN, Stephen, R. 1 Mariposa Court Los Alamos, NM 87544 / US | 02 /
QUANXI, Jia 209 Andanada Street Los Alamos, NM 87544 / US | 03 /
HAIYAN, Wang 3807 No. 2 Gold St. Los Alamos, NM 87544 / US | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2008/15] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 06788401.5 | 24.07.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006US28807 | Priority number, date | US20050189228 | 26.07.2005 Original published format: US 189228 | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007016079 | Date: | 08.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1908128 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L39/12, H01L39/24 | [2011/18] | CPC: |
H10N60/858 (EP,US);
H10N60/01 (KR);
H10N60/0296 (EP,US);
H10N60/0521 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/15] | H01L39/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRUKTUR FÜR VERBESSERTE HOCHKRITISCHE STROMDICHTEN IN YBCO-BESCHICHTUNGEN | [2008/15] | English: | STRUCTURE FOR IMPROVED HIGH CRITICAL CURRENT DENSITIES IN YBCO COATINGS | [2008/15] | French: | STRUCTURE DESTINEE A DES DENSITES DE COURANT HAUTEMENT CRITIQUES AMELIOREES DANS DES REVETEMENTS YBCO | [2008/15] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 07.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/21] | 15.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6383989 (JIA QUANXI [US], et al) [Y] 13,14* column 4, lines 43-58; claims 6-7 *; | [IDY] - JIA Q X ET AL, "High-temperature superconducting thick films with enhanced supercurrent carrying capability", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20020304), vol. 80, no. 9, doi:10.1063/1.1455143, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 1601 - 1603, XP012031719 [ID] 1-10,12,19 * the whole document * [Y] 11,13-18,20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1455143 | [Y] - FOLTYN S R ET AL, "High-Tc Coated Conductors - Performance of Meter-Long YBCO/IBAD Flexible Tapes", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON APPLIED SUPERCONDUCTIVITY,USA,, (199906), vol. 9, no. 2, ISSN 1051-8223, pages 1519 - 1522, XP002629253 [Y] 20 * page 1520, column 1, lines 21-22 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/77.784682 | [Y] - VAN WIJCK M A A M ET AL, "CeO2 as insulation layer in high Tc superconducting multilayer and crossover structures", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (19960122), vol. 68, no. 4, doi:10.1063/1.116397, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 553 - 555, XP012015696 [Y] 20 * page 554, column 1, lines 1-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.116397 | [Y] - ARENDT P N ET AL, "Biaxially Textured IBAD-MgO Templates for YBCO-Coated Conductors", MRS BULLETIN, MATER. RES. SOC., USA, (20040801), vol. 29, no. 8, pages 543 - 550, XP002629015 [Y] 11 * figure 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1557/mrs2004.160 | [Y] - MACMANUS-DRISCOLL J L ET AL, "Strongly enhanced current densities in superconducting coated conductors of YBa2Cu3O7-x + BaZrO3", NATURE MATERIALS,NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP,UK, (200407), vol. 3, no. 7, ISSN 1476-1122, pages 439 - 443, XP002629385 [Y] 15-18 * page 440, column 2, lines 1-6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmat1156 | International search | [A]US6194353 (NAKAMURA TAKAO [JP]); | [Y]US6383989 (JIA QUANXI [US], et al); | [Y]US2003144150 (ARENDT PAUL N [US], et al); | [A]US6809066 (READE RONALD P [US], et al); | [Y]US6830776 (BARNES PAUL N [US], et al) |