EP1906852 - MULTIPOLAR, VIRTUAL-ELECTRODE CATHETER WITH AT LEAST ONE SURFACE ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/15] | MULTIPOLAR, VIRTUAL-ELECTRODE CATHETER WITH AT LEAST ONE SURFACE ELECTRODE AND METHOD FOR ABLATION | ||
[2012/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states St. Jude Medical, Atrial Fibrillation Division, Inc. One St. Jude Medical Drive St. Paul, Minnesota 55117-9913 / US | [2012/34] |
Former [2009/43] | For all designated states St. Jude Medical, Atrial Fibrillation Division, Inc. One St. Jude Medical Drive St. Paul, Minnesota 55117-9913 / US | ||
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states St. Jude Medical, Atrial Fibrillation Division, Inc. 14901 DeVeau Place Minnetonka, MN 55345-2126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAUL, Saurav 2250 Plymouth Road, Apt. 302 Minnetonka, MN 55305 / US | 02 /
BELHE, Kedar Ravindra 1601 Hill Ridge Terrace Minnetonka, Minnesota 55305 / US | [2008/21] |
Former [2008/15] | 01 /
PAUL, Saurav 315 5th Street, S.E. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55414 / US | ||
02 /
BELHE, Kedar Ravindra 1601 Hill Ridge Terrace Minnetonka, Minnesota 55305 / US | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/39] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/15] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06788481.7 | 26.07.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006US28912 | Priority number, date | US20050190560 | 27.07.2005 Original published format: US 190560 | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007016123 | Date: | 08.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1906852 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1906852 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1472 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/15] | A61B18/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Title | German: | MULTIPOLARER KATHETER MIT VIRTUELLEN ELEKTRODEN MIT MINDESTENS EINER OBERFLÄCHENELEKTRODE | [2012/23] | English: | MULTIPOLAR, VIRTUAL-ELECTRODE CATHETER WITH AT LEAST ONE SURFACE ELECTRODE | [2012/23] | French: | CATHETER A ELECTRODE VIRTUELLE MULTIPOLAIRE DOTE D'AU MOINS UNE ELECTRODE DE SURFACE, | [2012/23] |
Former [2008/15] | MULTIPOLARER KATHETER MIT VIRTUELLEN ELEKTRODEN MIT MINDESTENS EINER OBERFLÄCHENELEKTRODE UND ABLATIONSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2008/15] | MULTIPOLAR, VIRTUAL-ELECTRODE CATHETER WITH AT LEAST ONE SURFACE ELECTRODE AND METHOD FOR ABLATION | ||
Former [2008/15] | CATHETER A ELECTRODE VIRTUELLE MULTIPOLAIRE DOTE D'AU MOINS UNE ELECTRODE DE SURFACE, ET PROCEDE D'ABLATION | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 05.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.05.2012 | 10.05.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.07.2006 | AT | 22.08.2012 | BE | 22.08.2012 | CY | 22.08.2012 | CZ | 22.08.2012 | DK | 22.08.2012 | EE | 22.08.2012 | FI | 22.08.2012 | LT | 22.08.2012 | LV | 22.08.2012 | MC | 22.08.2012 | NL | 22.08.2012 | PL | 22.08.2012 | RO | 22.08.2012 | SE | 22.08.2012 | SI | 22.08.2012 | SK | 22.08.2012 | TR | 22.08.2012 | BG | 22.11.2012 | GR | 23.11.2012 | ES | 03.12.2012 | IS | 22.12.2012 | PT | 24.12.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
MC | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
TR | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
MC | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 22.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002016589 (SWARTZ JOHN F [US], et al) [X] 1-12,15-17,20,31,32 * figures 1-11 *; | [X]US2003014047 (WOLOSZKO JEAN [US], et al) [X] 1* figure 8b *; | [X]US2004143255 (VANNEY GUY P [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,11,12,16,17,31,32 * figures 2-8,11 *; | [X]US2004143253 (VANNEY GUY P [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,11,12,16,17,31,32 * figures 2-10,13 *; | [A]US2005070894 (MCCLURKEN MICHAEL E [US]) [A] 1-36 * figures 20-49 * | International search | [Y]US2004215180 (STARKEBAUM WARREN L [US], et al); | [Y]US6849073 (HOEY MICHAEL F [US], et al); | [X]US6855143 (DAVISON PAUL O [US], et al) |