EP1909760 - TOCOPHERYL POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL SUCCINATE POWDER AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport TN 37660 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREGORY, Stephen Bwich Gwyn Farmhouse Tynygongl, YM LL748RF / GB | 02 /
JONES, Bruce, Colin 48 Bro Edryfed Liangefni, YM LL777WA / GB | 03 /
SINGLETON, Andy, Hugh 1616 Belmeade Drive Kingsport, TN 37664 / US | 04 /
JOHNSON, Wendy, Anne Postbus 5167 NL-2900 ED Capelle aan den Ljssel / NL | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Rees, Kerry, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | Rees, Kerry, et al FJ Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06788501.2 | 26.07.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006US28941 | Priority number, date | US20050705057P | 03.08.2005 Original published format: US 705057 P | [2008/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007019058 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1909760 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/14, A61K31/355 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
A23P10/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/355 (EP,US);
A61K47/34 (EP,US);
A61K9/145 (EP,US);
A61P3/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TOCOPHERYL-POLYETHYLEN-GLYCOL-SUCCINATPULVER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2008/16] | English: | TOCOPHERYL POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL SUCCINATE POWDER AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING SAME | [2008/16] | French: | POUDRE DE SUCCINATE DE TOCOPHERYL POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE CELLE-CI | [2008/16] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 19.01.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9949851 (BIORESPONSE LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,13-16 * example 4 * * claims 1-5 *; | [X]WO0120990 (BIORESPONSE LLC [US]) [X] 1-5,13-16 * page 14, line 25 - page 21, line 28 *; | [X]US5891469 (AMSELEM SHIMON [IL]) [X] 1-5,13-16 * column 5, line 30 - column 13, line 25 * | [X] - MU L ET AL, "Novel powder formulations for controlled delivery of poorly soluble anticancer drug: Application and investigation of TPGS and PEG in spray-dried particulate system", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20050418), vol. 103, no. 3, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 565 - 575, XP004831750 [X] 1-12 * page 567, column L - page 573, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2004.12.023 |