EP1907955 - CACHING AND MODIFYING PORTIONS OF A MULTI-DIMENSIONAL DATABASE ON A USER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Hai One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
RAMANATHAN, Sridharan Venkatramani One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
YANG, Xiaohong Mark One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06788558.2 | 25.07.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006US29026 | Priority number, date | US20050188439 | 25.07.2005 Original published format: US 188439 | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007014274 | Date: | 01.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1907955 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
G06F16/24552 (EP,US);
G06F16/283 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Title | German: | ZWISCHENSPEICHERUNG UND ÄNDERUNG VON TEILEN EINER MEHRDIMENSIONALEN DATENBANK AUF EINEM BENUTZERGERÄT | [2008/15] | English: | CACHING AND MODIFYING PORTIONS OF A MULTI-DIMENSIONAL DATABASE ON A USER DEVICE | [2008/15] | French: | MISE EN ANTEMEMOIRE ET MODIFICATION DE PARTIES D'UNE BASE DE DONNEES MULTIDIMENSIONNELLE SUR UN DISPOSITIF UTILISATEUR | [2008/15] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 10.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/27] | 23.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2004072810 (NETEZZA CORP [US], et al) [Y] 2-7,9-15,18-20 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line L; claim - * * page 11, line 22 - page 14, line 3 *; | [A]EP1477912 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] * abstract *; | [A]US6741997 (LIU JING [US], et al) [A] * abstract * * column 1, line 25 - column 4, line 15 * * column 5, line 20 - column 12, line 31 *; | [XY] - SCHLESINGER L ET AL, "Efficiently synchronizing multidimensional schema data", ACM INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON DATA WAREHOUSING AND OLAP (DOLAP) 2001 ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY US, (2001), pages 69 - 76, XP002569398 [X] 1,8,16,17 [Y] 2-7,9-15,18-20 | [XY] - ANONYMOUS, "Architecture and Benefits of PowerOLAP?", PARIS TECHNOLOGY WHITE PAPER, Internet, (2001), pages 1 - 7, URL: http://www.biolap.co.uk/dld/PowerOLAP%20Architecture%20&%20Benefits.pdf, (20100218), XP002569399 [X] 1,8,16,17 * page 4, paragraph 1 - page 7, paragraph L * [Y] 2-7,9-15,18-20 | [A] - KILIMCI, P ET AL, "OLAP in enterprise decision modelling", IADIS INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE WWW/INTERNET 2004, (2004), pages 885 - 888, XP002569400 [A] * abstract * | International search | [X]US5978796 (MALLOY WILLIAM EARL [US], et al); | [Y]US6182060 (HEDGCOCK ROBERT [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2004072810 |