EP1909838 - FORMULATIONS THAT INHIBIT PROTEIN AGGREGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMGEN INC. M/S 27-4-A One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US | [2008/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRYCH, Stephen R. 383 Country Club Drive, Apt. 4 Simi Valley, CA 93065 / US | 02 /
MATSUMURA, Masazumi 2286 La Granada Dr. Thousand Oaks, CA 91362 / US | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/42] | Vogelsang-Wenke, Heike, et al Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/16] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06789108.5 | 31.07.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006US29931 | Priority number, date | US20050703547P | 29.07.2005 Original published format: US 703547 P | US20050703551P | 29.07.2005 Original published format: US 703551 P | [2008/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007016562 | Date: | 08.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1909838 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/02 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K47/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Extension states | AL | 24.01.2008 | BA | 24.01.2008 | HR | 24.01.2008 | MK | 24.01.2008 | RS | 24.01.2008 | Title | German: | FORMULIERUNGEN FÜR PROTEINAGGREGATIONSHEMMUNG | [2008/16] | English: | FORMULATIONS THAT INHIBIT PROTEIN AGGREGATION | [2008/16] | French: | FORMULATIONS INHIBANT L'AGREGATION DE PROTEINES | [2008/16] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 28.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 03.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/28] | 27.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005033143 ; | [E]EP1698640 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]) [E] 1-31 * paragraphs [0046] - [0050] *; | [DPX]WO2006069202 (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [DPX] 1-14 * example 11 *; | [XY]WO2004100979 (ARES TRADING SA [CH], et al) [X] 15-31 * example 1 * * page 9, paragraph 1 * [Y] 1-14; | [DX]US2004033535 (BOYLE WILLIAM J [US], et al) [DX] 1-31 * paragraph [0202] *; | [DX]US2005074821 (WILD KENNETH D [US], et al) [DX] 1-31 * paragraphs [0258] , [0260] *; | [DX]US6254868 (LEUNG SHUI-ON [US], et al) [DX] 1-14 * example 12 *; | [DX]US5789554 (LEUNG SHUI-ON [US], et al) [DX] 1-14 * example 7 *; | [DX]US6235883 (JAKOBOVITS AYA [US], et al) [DX] 1-14 * example - *; | [A]US6238664 (HELLERBRAND KLAUS [DE], et al) [A] 1-31 * the whole document * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 31, Database accession no. 2005-306088, XP002414543 & WO2005033143 A1 20050414 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK) [X] 1-31 * abstract * | [XY] - WANG W, "Protein aggregation and its inhibition in biopharmaceutics", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20050131), vol. 289, no. 1-2, ISSN 0378-5173, pages 1 - 30, XP004967405 [X] 15-31 * page 20, paragraphs 4.2.2-4.2.3 * * page 20, paragraphs 4.2.2-4.2.3 * [Y] 1-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijpharm.2004.11.014 | Examination | WO03039485 |