EP1920460 - METHODS OF FORMING THROUGH-WAFER INTERCONNECTS AND STRUCTURES RESULTING THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2016 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way, Mail Stop 525, P.O. Box 6 Boise, ID 83707-0006 / US | [2008/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARNWORTH, Warren M. 2004 South Banner Nampa, ID 83686 / US | 02 /
WOOD, Alan G. 1366 East Versailles Court Boise, ID 83706 / US | [2008/20] | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2016/07] |
Former [2009/51] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2008/20] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06789238.0 | 02.08.2006 | [2008/20] | WO2006US30167 | Priority number, date | US20050198338 | 05.08.2005 Original published format: US 198338 | [2008/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007019199 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1920460 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1920460 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/768, H01L23/48 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
H01L21/768 (KR);
H01L21/76898 (EP,US);
H01L23/48 (KR);
H01L23/481 (EP,US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/07] |
Former [2008/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BILDUNG VON WAFERDURCHGANGSVERBINDUNGEN UND SICH DARAUS ERGEBENDE STRUKTUREN | [2008/20] | English: | METHODS OF FORMING THROUGH-WAFER INTERCONNECTS AND STRUCTURES RESULTING THEREFROM | [2008/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'INTERCONNEXIONS TRAVERSANT UNE PLAQUETTE ET STRUCTURES EN RÉSULTANT | [2015/40] |
Former [2008/20] | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D INTERCONNEXIONS TRAVERSANT UNE GALETTE ET STRUCTURES EN RÉSULTANT | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 15.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.08.2006 | AT | 17.02.2016 | BE | 17.02.2016 | CY | 17.02.2016 | CZ | 17.02.2016 | DK | 17.02.2016 | EE | 17.02.2016 | ES | 17.02.2016 | FI | 17.02.2016 | IS | 17.02.2016 | IT | 17.02.2016 | LT | 17.02.2016 | LV | 17.02.2016 | MC | 17.02.2016 | NL | 17.02.2016 | PL | 17.02.2016 | RO | 17.02.2016 | SE | 17.02.2016 | SI | 17.02.2016 | SK | 17.02.2016 | TR | 17.02.2016 | BG | 17.05.2016 | GR | 18.05.2016 | PT | 17.06.2016 | IE | 02.08.2016 | LU | 02.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 02.08.2006 | |
AT | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CY | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
TR | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
IE | 02.08.2016 | ||
LU | 02.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 02.08.2006 | |
AT | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CY | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
IE | 02.08.2016 | ||
LU | 02.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
IE | 02.08.2016 | ||
LU | 02.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 17.02.2016 | |
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005121768 (EDELSTEIN DANIEL C [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9,11,12 * paragraphs [0036] , [0039] , [0040]; figure 4 *; | [XAY]US2005106845 (HALAHAN PATRICK B [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10,11 * paragraphs [0036] - [0075]; figures 14-16 * [A] 13-25 [Y] 6; | [Y]US2005136568 (FUKAZAWA MOTOHIKO [JP]) [Y] 6 * paragraphs [0041] , [0052]; figures 3,4 *; | [X]US5843844 (MIYANAGA ISAO [JP]) [X] 1,9-11,13-18,20-23 * column 6, line 19 - column 7, line 57; figures 2,3 *; | [X]EP0926723 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) [X] 1,9,11,13-17,20-25 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004217483 (HEDLER HARRY [DE], et al) [A] 1-25 * paragraphs [0025] - [0040]; figures 10-13 * | Examination | US2005087853 | US2002127839 |