EP1915224 - METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR MAKING LITHOGRAPHIC PLATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nela Ternes Register Group, Inc. 7435 4th Street North Oakdale, MN 55128 / US | [2008/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEIS, Robert, M. 327 Soo Line Road Hudson, Wisconsin 54016 / US | 02 /
HOELLE, Matthias Hauptstrasse 103 79365 Rheinhausen / DE | 03 /
BURKHART, David, G. 7828 Upper 17th Street North Oakdale, Minnesota 55128 / US | [2008/18] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/18] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06789781.9 | 15.08.2006 | [2008/18] | WO2006US31866 | Priority number, date | US20050708196P | 15.08.2005 Original published format: US 708196 P | [2008/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007022197 | Date: | 22.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1915224 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B21D11/00 | [2008/18] | CPC: |
B41C1/1083 (EP,US);
B21D5/04 (EP,US);
B41F27/1281 (EP,US);
B41N1/08 (EP,US);
B41N1/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON LITHOGRAPHISCHEN DRUCKPLATTEN | [2008/18] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR MAKING LITHOGRAPHIC PLATES | [2008/18] | French: | PROCEDES ET APPAREILS D'ELABORATION DE PLAQUES LITHOGRAPHIQUES | [2008/18] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/18] | 01.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/40] | 19.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US5461893 (TYLER ARTHUR W [US]); | [Y]US5502993 (POWERS JOHN W [US], et al); | [A]US5771725 (MIZUKAWA SUEHIRO [JP]); | [Y]US2004103706 (CODATTO ANTONIO [IT]); | [A]US2005120899 (GELBART DANIEL [CA], et al) |