EP1951463 - PIPE CUTTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IPC Developments Pty Ltd PO Box 5690 Maroochydore BC QLD 4558 / AU | [2010/50] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states Sunpak Pty Ltd ATF The AFT Family Discretionary Trust PO Box 5960 Maroochydore, QLD 4558 / AU | ||
For all designated states Vince, Roderic Henry 3 Sandpiper CI Buderim, QLD 4556 / AU | |||
For all designated states Vince, Heather Fairbairn 3 Sandpiper CI Buderim, QLD 4556 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VINCE, Roderic Henry 3 Sandpiper CI. Buderim, QLD 4556 / AU | [2011/04] |
Former [2008/32] | 01 /
VINCE, Roderic Henry 3 Sandpiper CI. Buderim, QLD 4556 / AU | ||
02 /
VINCE, Heather Fairbairn 3 Sandpiper CI. Buderim, QLD 4556 / AU | Representative(s) | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 06790324.5 | 06.10.2006 | [2008/32] | WO2006AU01454 | Priority number, date | AU20050905609 | 06.10.2005 Original published format: AU 2005905609 | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007038838 | Date: | 12.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1951463 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 12.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B23D21/14, B26D1/143, B26D5/16 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
B23D21/14 (EP,US);
B26D3/163 (EP,US);
Y10T83/0596 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/32] | Title | German: | ROHRSCHNEIDER | [2008/32] | English: | PIPE CUTTER | [2008/32] | French: | COUPE-TUYAU | [2008/32] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/43] | 10.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.04.2010 | 31.10.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2004209565 ; | [X]US4524511 (MONTIERO RICHARD [US]); | [A]JP2001150224 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 52, Database accession no. 2004-538432, XP003011218 & JP2004209565 A 20040729 (DIPPU YG) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 61, Database accession no. 2001-544293, XP003011219 & JP2001150224 A 20010605 (TOKYO GAS CO LTD) |