EP1951387 - DIVERSIONARY THERAPY APPARATUS AND METHODS AND INTERACTIVE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diversionary Therapy Technologies Pty Ltd Sherwood House, Level 11 39 Sherwood Road Toowong, QLD 4066 / AU | [2012/32] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states Diversionary Therapy Technologies Pty Ltd Ground Floor 54 Jephson Street Toowong, QLD 4006 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAPMAN, Ben, Niall 40 Rodway Street Zillmere, Queensland 4034 / AU | 02 /
BUCOLO, Sam 67 Maygar Street Grange, Queensland 4030 / AU | 03 /
SMITH, Glenn 54 Funnell Street Zillmere, Queensland 4059 / AU | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2012/49] |
Former [2008/32] | Texier, Christian, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06790392.2 | 17.10.2006 | [2008/32] | WO2006AU01531 | Priority number, date | AU20050905719 | 17.10.2005 Original published format: AU 2005905719 | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007045021 | Date: | 26.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1951387 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 26.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/10, A63F9/24, A61M21/00, G06F3/033 | [2011/46] | CPC: |
A61M21/02 (EP,US);
A63F13/10 (EP);
A63F13/2145 (US);
A63F13/285 (US);
A63F13/428 (US);
A63F13/45 (EP);
A63F13/92 (US);
G06F3/0346 (EP,US);
A61M2021/0022 (EP,US);
A61M2021/0027 (EP,US);
A61M2021/005 (EP,US);
A61M2205/215 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3375 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3561 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3569 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3584 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3592 (EP,US);
A61M2205/43 (EP,US);
A61M2205/505 (EP,US);
A61M2205/581 (EP,US);
A61M2205/582 (EP,US);
A61M2205/583 (EP,US);
A61M2205/587 (EP,US);
A61M2205/59 (EP,US);
A61M2205/6027 (EP,US);
A61M2205/6045 (EP,US);
A61M2205/6072 (EP,US);
A61M2209/08 (EP,US);
A61M2230/04 (EP,US);
A61M2230/06 (EP,US);
A61M2230/10 (EP,US);
A61M2230/205 (EP,US);
A61M2230/30 (EP,US);
A61M2230/42 (EP,US);
A61M2230/50 (EP,US);
A61M2230/60 (EP,US);
A61M2230/62 (EP,US);
A61M2230/63 (EP,US);
A61M2230/65 (EP,US);
A63F2300/1012 (EP,US);
A63F2300/1043 (EP,US);
A63F2300/105 (EP,US);
A63F2300/1062 (EP,US);
A63F2300/1075 (EP,US);
A63F2300/1087 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61M2230/04, A61M2230/005 (US,EP);
A61M2230/06, A61M2230/005 (US,EP);
A61M2230/10, A61M2230/005 (US,EP);
A61M2230/205, A61M2230/005 (US,EP);
A61M2230/30, A61M2230/005 (EP,US);
A61M2230/42, A61M2230/005 (EP,US);
A61M2230/50, A61M2230/005 (EP,US);
A61M2230/60, A61M2230/005 (EP,US);
A61M2230/62, A61M2230/005 (EP,US);
A61M2230/63, A61M2230/005 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2008/32] | A63F9/24, A61M21/00, G06F3/033 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/32] | Title | German: | ABLENKUNGSTHERAPIEVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN UND INTERAKTIVE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2008/32] | English: | DIVERSIONARY THERAPY APPARATUS AND METHODS AND INTERACTIVE DEVICES | [2008/32] | French: | APPAREIL DE THÉRAPIE DE DIVERSION ET PROCÉDÉS DE MÊME QUE DISPOSITIFS INTERACTIFS | [2008/32] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 16.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 03.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/13] | 07.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5190285 (LEVY ROBERT B [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,6,7,9,10,13-15 * columns 1,3,4,8; figures 1,3,4,5,6,7 * * columns 15,16 *; | [A]EP0875821 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,9,14,15* abstract *; | [Y]US5918603 (BROWN STEPHEN J [US]) [Y] 1-4,6,7,9,10,13-15 * column 7, line 25 - line 32 * * column 4, line 23 - line 31 * * abstract * * column 8, paragraph 55 - column 9, paragraph 15 *; | [IY]WO0057975 (COOK BRANDT A [US]) [I] 1,2,4,7,9,13-15 * paragraphs [0114] , [0115] , [0048] , [0085] - [0100]; figures 1,3,10,11,20,21,; claims 22,30-35,61 * [Y] 1-4,6,7,9,10,13-15; | [IY]US2003216176 (SHIMIZU TAKAO [JP], et al) [I] 1,2,4,7,9,13-15 * paragraphs [0053] - [0058]; figures 2,4,5,8-15 * [Y] 1-4,6,7,9,10,13-15 | International search | [A]US5453758 (SATO KAZUHIRO [JP]); | [X]US5602566 (MOTOSYUKU HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US5757360 (NITTA TOHEI [US], et al); | [X]WO9918495 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [X]US6347290 (BARTLETT JOEL F [US]); | [X]WO03025730 (INTEL CORP [US]); | [X]US6573883 (BARTLETT JOEL F [US]); | [A]EP1434187 (DINIS ALAIN [FR]) | by applicant | WO0057975 | US2003216176 |