EP1917083 - APPARATUS FOR PRODUCTION, WITHDRAWAL AND TRANSFER OF HIGHLY VISCOUS SLURRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rio Tinto Alcan International Limited 400-1190 Avenue des Canadiens de Montréal Montréal, QC H3B 0E3 / CA | [2016/46] |
Former [2016/19] | For all designated states Rio Tinto Alcan International Limited 1188 Sherbrooke Street West Montréal, QC H3A 3G2 / CA | ||
Former [2008/19] | For all designated states ALCAN INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 1188 Sherbrooke Street West Montreal Quebec H3A 3G2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PELOQUIN, Guy 2214, Ste-sophie Jonquière, Québec G7S 5P7 / CA | 02 /
DUFOUR, Renald 4046, Borduas Jonquière, Québec G7X 1G6 / CA | 03 /
CARRUTHERS, Andrew, N. 14 Doric Beaconsfield, Québec H9W 3X1 / CA | 04 /
PUXLEY, Donald 1820 Bello Jonquière, Québec G7S 2N3 / CA | [2008/19] | Representative(s) | Malcoiffe, Julien, et al Rio Tinto France SAS 725, rue Aristide Bergès BP 25 Voreppe 38341 Moirans Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/46] | Mérigeault, Thierry Louis Henri, et al Rio Tinto France SAS Industrial Property Department 725, rue Aristide Bergès BP25 Voreppe 38341 Moirans Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2010/03] | Williams, Ceili, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1, Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BG / GB | ||
Former [2008/19] | Williams, Ceili, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06790553.9 | 21.08.2006 | [2008/19] | WO2006CA01370 | Priority number, date | US20050710455P | 23.08.2005 Original published format: US 710455 P | [2008/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007022622 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1917083 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1917083 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 01.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01D21/24, B01D21/02, C22B3/22 | [2008/19] | CPC: |
C22B3/22 (EP,US);
B01D21/04 (EP,US);
B01D21/06 (EP,US);
B01D21/186 (EP,US);
B01D21/2461 (EP,US);
B01D21/286 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/46] |
Former [2008/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG, ZUM ABZIEHEN UND ZUM TRANSFER EINER HOCHVISKOSEN AUFSCHLÄMMUNG | [2008/19] | English: | APPARATUS FOR PRODUCTION, WITHDRAWAL AND TRANSFER OF HIGHLY VISCOUS SLURRY | [2008/19] | French: | APPAREIL CONÇU POUR PRODUIRE, EVACUER ET TRANSFERER DES BOUES HAUTEMENT VISQUEUSES | [2008/19] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 22.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 13.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.09.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.11.2017 | CY | 15.11.2017 | CZ | 15.11.2017 | DK | 15.11.2017 | EE | 15.11.2017 | FI | 15.11.2017 | LT | 15.11.2017 | LV | 15.11.2017 | MC | 15.11.2017 | NL | 15.11.2017 | PL | 15.11.2017 | PT | 15.11.2017 | SE | 15.11.2017 | SK | 15.11.2017 | BG | 15.02.2018 | IS | 15.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PT | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 15.11.2017 | |
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE8528469U (SIEKE, HELMUT, DIPL.-ING., 6200 WIESBADEN, DE) [X] 1,2,7-16,18,19,22,23 * page 6, line 14 - page 7, line 5; figure 1 *; | [X]DE4401840 (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]) [X] 1,2,7-16,18,19,22,23 * column 1, line 24 - line 65; figure 1 *; | [X]DE9415883U (NOGGERATH HOLDING GMBH CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,7-16,18,19,22,23* page 7, line 3 - page 9, line 5; figure 1 * | International search | [X]JP2004160417 ; | [Y]WO02062683 (DUNBRIAR INVEST LTD, et al); | [X]US2005042064 (KULBETH ROBERT M [US]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP2004160417 A 20040610 (ODAKA, S. ET AL.) | Examination | SU623834 | US4830507 | - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1979, no. 27, Database accession no. 1979-50586B, & SU623834 A 19780802 (CONS IND SANITATION) |