EP1931459 - TRANSFER APPARATUS AND SYSTEM, AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haggerty, Ken 37, Hi Mount Drive Willowdale Ontario, M2K 1X3 / CA | [2008/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VENHUIS, Sarah 9 Myers Lane Ancaster, Ontario L9G 0A5 / CA | [2008/29] |
Former [2008/27] | 01 /
VENHUIS, Sarah 200 Bay Street, South, Apt. 2211 Hamilton, Ontario L8P 4S4 / CA | ||
Former [2008/25] | 01 /
VENHUIS, Sarah 200 Bay Street, South Apt. 2211 Hamilton, Ontario L8P 4S4 / CA | Representative(s) | Brand, Thomas Louis WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/25] | Brand, Thomas Louis W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06790672.7 | 12.09.2006 | [2008/25] | WO2006CA01498 | Priority number, date | US20050715580P | 12.09.2005 Original published format: US 715580 P | [2008/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007030924 | Date: | 22.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1931459 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 22.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01J10/00, B01F5/06, B01F3/04, B01J19/18, B01J19/32, C02F1/58, C02F1/66 | [2008/25] | CPC: |
B01D53/8678 (EP,US);
B01F23/2342 (EP,US);
B01D53/885 (EP,US);
B01F23/237612 (EP,US);
B01F23/237613 (EP,US);
B01F25/50 (EP,US);
B01F33/811 (EP,US);
B01J10/007 (EP,US);
B01J12/007 (EP,US);
B01J14/005 (EP,US);
B01J19/1887 (EP,US);
C02F1/20 (EP,US);
C02F1/78 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0004 (EP,US);
C02F1/32 (EP,US);
C02F1/66 (EP,US);
C02F1/725 (EP,US);
C02F2101/16 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/25] | Title | German: | TRANSFERVORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM UND VERWENDUNGEN DAFÜR | [2008/25] | English: | TRANSFER APPARATUS AND SYSTEM, AND USES THEREOF | [2008/25] | French: | APPAREIL ET SYSTEME DE TRANSFERT ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2008/25] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/25] | 21.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/46] | 25.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2737376 (GUSTAF HAGLUND) [X] 1-6,11-16,23 * column 1, line 15 - line 22 * * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 16 * * column 4, line 57 - line 68 ** figure - *; | [X]GB812474 (EDDY WILLIAM ECKEY) [X] 1-6,11-16,23 * page 1, line 9 - line 17 * * page 3, line 86 - line 91 * * page 4, line 97 - line 122 * * page 5, line 13 - line 47 * * figures 1-2 *; | [X]DE1183052 (EDDY W ECKEY) [X] 1-6,11-16,23 * column 1, line 1 - line 6 * * column 3, line 16 - line 46 * * column 5, line 1 - line 9 * * column 5, line 61 - line 64 * * figures 1,12 *; | [X]US4789469 (CVITAS VILIM [AT], et al) [X] 1-6,11-16,23 * column 1, line 8 - line 15 * * column 4, line 24 - line 52 * * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 13 * * figure - *; | [XA]US4999302 (KAHLER BRETT D [CA], et al) [X] 1,3-6,11,13-16,23 * column 1, line 6 - line 8 * * column 3, line 9 - line 47 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 49 * * figures 1-6 * [A] 2,12; | [XA]EP0853067 (GEUNA ENRICO [IT]) [X] 1,3-6,23 * column 1, line 3 - line 12 * * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 38 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 2,11-16 | International search | [X]US4999302 (KAHLER BRETT D [CA], et al); | [X]EP0853067 (GEUNA ENRICO [IT]); | [XP]WO2005113454 (MILLER GARY [US]); | [X]WO0048728 (UNIV NEWCASTLE [GB], et al); | [X]CA1155403 (ICI LTD) |