EP1938501 - RENDERING SUBJECT IDENTIFICATION ON PROTECTED MESSAGES LACKING SUCH IDENTIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.10.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 14.11.2012 [2012/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADAMS, Neil 550 Little Dover Crescent Waterloo, Ontario N2K 4E4 / CA | [2008/27] | Representative(s) | Patel, Binesh Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | Patel, Binesh Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | ||
Former [2008/23] | Patel, Binesh Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Birmingham West Midlands, B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 06790745.1 | 26.09.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006CA01580 | Priority number, date | US20050720053P | 26.09.2005 Original published format: US 720053 P | [2008/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007033496 | Date: | 29.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1938501 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 29.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/00, H04L12/54 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
G06Q10/107 (EP,US);
G06F21/6218 (EP,US);
H04L51/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/27] | Extension states | AL | 25.03.2008 | BA | 25.03.2008 | HR | 25.03.2008 | MK | 25.03.2008 | RS | 25.03.2008 | Title | German: | WIEDERGABE DER BETREFFIDENTIFIKATION AN GESCHÜTZTEN NACHRICHTEN, BEI DENEN EINE SOLCHE IDENTIFIKATION FEHLT | [2008/27] | English: | RENDERING SUBJECT IDENTIFICATION ON PROTECTED MESSAGES LACKING SUCH IDENTIFICATION | [2008/27] | French: | RENDU D'IDENTIFICATION D'INTERET SUR DES MESSAGES PROTEGES EXEMPTS D'UNE TELLE IDENTIFICATION | [2008/27] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 22.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.06.2012 | 14.06.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/46] | 08.07.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002120692 (SCHIAVONE VINCENT J [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1288812 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-20* the whole document * | International search | [A]US6684088 (HALAHMI EREZ [IL]); | [A]US2004168055 (LORD ROBERT B [US], et al); | [A]US2004205248 (LITTLE HERBERT A [CA], et al) | Examination | WO9919816 | US2002143871 | US2003105589 |