EP1945694 - NOVEL WATER-BASED ADHESIVES FOR INDUSTRIAL APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 25.09.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation 1000 Uniqema Boulevard New Castle Delaware 19720 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATEL, Nalini 27 Turner Road Langley, Berkshire SL3 7AL / GB | 02 /
STOPPS, Rebbeca Flat 3 33 Southerton Rd London W6 0PJ / GB | 03 /
MAGNIN, Christophe Les Monterniers F-69430 Lantignie / FR | [2012/02] |
Former [2008/30] | 01 /
PATEL, Nalini 27 Turner Road Langley, Berkshire SL3 7AL / GB | ||
02 /
STOPPS, Rebbeca Flat 3 33 Southerton Rd London W6 0PJ / GB | |||
03 /
MAGNIN, Christophe Les Monterniers F-69430 Lantignie / FR | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/37] |
Former [2008/30] | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 03 29 81630 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06791829.2 | 05.09.2006 | [2008/30] | WO2006EP08627 | Priority number, date | EP20050020034 | 14.09.2005 Original published format: EP 05020034 | [2008/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007031211 | Date: | 22.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1945694 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1945694 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/12 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
C08J3/05 (EP,US);
C09J103/02 (EP,US);
C09J189/00 (EP,US);
C08J2301/26 (EP,US);
C08L23/0846 (EP,US);
C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09J103/02, C08L2666/04 (EP,US);
C09J189/00, C08L2666/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/30] | Title | German: | NEUE KLEBSTOFFE AUF WASSERBASIS FÜR TECHNISCHE ANWENDUNGEN | [2008/30] | English: | NOVEL WATER-BASED ADHESIVES FOR INDUSTRIAL APPLICATIONS | [2008/30] | French: | NOUVEAUX ADHÉSIFS À BASE D'EAU POUR DES APPLICATIONS INDUSTRIELLES | [2008/30] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 14.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.10.2012
15.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel Coatings International B.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Akzo Nobel IP Department Christian Neefestraat 2 1077 WW Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2017/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.10.2012
15.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel Coatings International B.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Akzo Nobel IP Department Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [2012/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.10.2012
Akzo Nobel Coatings International B.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative De Vries, Adriaan Jacobus Akzo Nobel N.V. Legal, IP & Compliance P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | 15.11.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.05.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.03.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.04.2015 | 22.04.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.06.2015 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 13.06.2015 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2015/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.09.2006 | AT | 11.01.2012 | BE | 11.01.2012 | CY | 11.01.2012 | CZ | 11.01.2012 | DK | 11.01.2012 | EE | 11.01.2012 | FI | 11.01.2012 | LT | 11.01.2012 | LV | 11.01.2012 | PL | 11.01.2012 | RO | 11.01.2012 | SI | 11.01.2012 | SK | 11.01.2012 | TR | 11.01.2012 | BG | 11.04.2012 | GR | 12.04.2012 | IS | 11.05.2012 | PT | 11.05.2012 | IE | 05.09.2012 | LU | 05.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
IE | 05.09.2012 | ||
LU | 05.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
IE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
IE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | SI | 11.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0254467 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1-14* the whole document *; | [X]DE19908560 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1038903 (CLARIANT INT LTD [CH]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]US6245853 (TANG KWOK [CA], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0192401 (STALEY MFG CO A E [US]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]WO03004562 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1454943 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004266929 (IMAI DAISUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0254467 | DE19908560 | EP1038903 | EP1098916 | US6245853 | EP1109838 | WO0192402 | WO03004562 | EP1454943 | US2004266929 |