EP1945217 - COMBINATIONS COMPRISING A VEGF RECEPTOR INHIBITOR AND A PENETRATION ENHANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2012/18] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BILLICH, Andreas Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research GmbH & Co KG Brunner Strasse 59 A-1235 Vienna / AT | 02 /
STÜTZ, Anton Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research GmbH & Co KG Brunner Strasse 59 A-1235 Wien / AT | [2012/18] |
Former [2008/30] | 01 /
BILLICH, Andreas Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research GmbH & Co KG Brunner Strasse 59 A-1235 Vienna / AT | ||
02 /
STÜTZ, Anton Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research GmbH & Co KG Brunner Strasse 59 A-1235 Wien / AT | Representative(s) | Lettenbichler-Ager, Isolde Maria Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Lettenbichler-Ager, Isolde Maria Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2008/30] | Lettenbichler, Isolde Maria Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 06791989.4 | 12.09.2006 | [2008/30] | WO2006EP08857 | Priority number, date | GB20050018671 | 13.09.2005 Original published format: GB 0518671 | GB20050018672 | 13.09.2005 Original published format: GB 0518672 | [2008/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007031265 | Date: | 22.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1945217 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1945217 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/505, A61K31/506, A61K31/519, A61K31/538, A61K31/501, A61K31/44, A61K9/00, A61K9/70, A61K9/48, A61K47/10, A61K47/20, A61P17/00, A61P17/06, A61P17/10 | [2011/46] | CPC: |
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K31/505 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/44 (EP,US);
A61K31/501 (EP,US);
A61K31/506 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/538 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K47/20 (EP,US);
A61K9/4858 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/30] | A61K31/505, A61K31/506, A61K31/519, A61K31/538, A61K31/501, A61K31/44, A61K9/70, A61P17/00, A61P17/06, A61P17/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/30] | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONEN AUS EINEM VEGF-REZEPTOR-HEMMER UND EINEM PENETRATIONSVERSTÄRKER | [2008/30] | English: | COMBINATIONS COMPRISING A VEGF RECEPTOR INHIBITOR AND A PENETRATION ENHANCER | [2008/30] | French: | COMBINAISONS COMPRENANT UN INHIBITEUR DES RÉCEPTEURS VEGF ET UN AGENT AMÉLIORANT LA PÉNÉTRATION | [2011/46] |
Former [2008/30] | COMBINAISONS COMPRENANT UN INHIBITEUR DES RECEPTEURS VEGF | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 16.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.12.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 09.12.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.09.2006 | AT | 02.05.2012 | BE | 02.05.2012 | CY | 02.05.2012 | CZ | 02.05.2012 | DK | 02.05.2012 | EE | 02.05.2012 | FI | 02.05.2012 | IT | 02.05.2012 | LT | 02.05.2012 | LV | 02.05.2012 | NL | 02.05.2012 | PL | 02.05.2012 | RO | 02.05.2012 | SE | 02.05.2012 | SI | 02.05.2012 | SK | 02.05.2012 | TR | 02.05.2012 | BG | 02.08.2012 | GR | 03.08.2012 | ES | 13.08.2012 | IS | 02.09.2012 | PT | 03.09.2012 | GB | 12.09.2012 | IE | 12.09.2012 | LU | 12.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | FR | 01.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
TR | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
GB | 12.09.2012 | ||
IE | 12.09.2012 | ||
LU | 12.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
TR | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
GB | 12.09.2012 | ||
IE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
GB | 12.09.2012 | ||
IE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
GB | 12.09.2012 | ||
IE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
GB | 12.09.2012 | ||
IE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 02.05.2012 | |
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 02.05.2012 | |
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 02.05.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6355657 (OSBORNE DAVID W [US]) [A] 9 * column 1, lines 10-14 * * column 2, lines 8-30 * * column 3, lines 12-21 * * claims 6,7 *; | [A]EP1415987 (EISAI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,4,12-18 * page 56, paragraphs 204-207 * * pages 60-62; examples pharmacological-test-example-3 * * page 66, paragraph 244 * * page 310, lines 40-45 * * page 311, lines 20-25,50-55 *; | [X]WO2005021553 (PFIZER [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10-18 * page 1, lines 4-7 * * page 12, lines 6-31 * * page 18, lines 8-26,35-37 * * page 35, lines 28,29 * * examples 16-28 * * page 89, lines 4-11 *; | [A]EP1522540 (EISAI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,4,12-18 * page 40, paragraphs 147,148 * * pages 42-44; examples pharmacological-test-example-2 * * page 130, lines 45-50; examples 90-2 * * page 132, lines 5-10; examples 134-1 * * page 133, lines 5-10; examples 176-1 * * page 142, paragraphs 612-614 * * claims 1,43 *; | [X]WO2005070891 (AMGEN INC [US]) [X] 1-6,10-18 * page 46, lines 10-14 * * page 47, lines 19-23 * * page 49, lines 3,4 * * page 57, lines 24-29 * * compounds 149-155,179-196,241,363-378,380-396,398-403 * * compounds 421-456,458-460,464,471,503-515,517-537,666-685 * * compounds 783-795 * * page 406, lines 15-30 *; | [X]WO2005069906 (UNIV YALE [US], et al) [X] 1,10-18 * page 10, lines 23-31 * * page 16, lines 23-29 * * page 17, line 27 - page 18, line 1 * * page 26, lines 11-18 * * page 28, lines 14,15 * * page 34, lines 3-10 * * claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP1568368 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [A] 1,10-18 * page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 14, paragraph 35 * * page 16, paragraphs 54,57 * * page 17, paragraphs 64,67 * * page 18, paragraph 78 *; | [PA]WO2006059234 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [PA] 1-6,9-18 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 1, paragraph 4 - page 2, paragraph L * * page 13, paragraph L - page 14, paragraph 2 * * page 15, paragraph 2 - page 16, paragraph 1 * * page 23, paragraph 3 * * page 24, paragraph 3 * * example - ** claim - *; | [A] - T.C.K. CHAN, "Percutaneous penetration enhancers: an update", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 9TH BIENNAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF PERSPECTIVES IN PERCUTANEOUS PENETRATION, (200501), pages 18 - 22, XP002416625 [A] * page 18, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 19, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 20, column 1, paragraphs 2-4 * * page 22, column 2, paragraph 3 * | by applicant | WO03099771 |